Huffnagle et al v. Loiacono

Plaintiff: James Huffnagle, James Hearn, Reinhold Holtkamp, William Hemrick, Melvin W. Martin and Howard Luartes
Defendant: Anthony Loiacono
Case Number: 3:2011cv01009
Filed: October 24, 2011
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Dickson
Referring Judge: John S. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Todd J. Campbell
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 31, 2012 40 Opinion or Order of the Court CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 7/31/12. (SEE ORDER FOR OTHER DETAILS) (dt)
November 26, 2012 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Counsel for the parties shall confer and file on or before December 10, 2012, a proposed revised scheduling order containing appropriate deadlines consistent with the new trial date of January 14, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 11/26/12. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
December 11, 2012 46 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery deadline reset for 5/1/2013. Dispositive Motions deadline reset for 8/15/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 12/11/12. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
April 11, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: For the reasons stated within this Order, plaintiffs' motion to compel discovery 47 is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 4/11/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
April 11, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Magistrate Judge Bryant finds that plaintiffs' motion to quash the deposition notices for the week of April 15 should be GRANTED due to the unavailability of plaintiffs' counsel during that week. The undersigned further finds, howe ver, that these depositions need to be taken as soon as reasonably possible, and that the deadline for completing fact discovery should be EXTENDED from May 1, 2013, until July 31, 2013. Counsel are directed to confer in good faith in an attempt to reschedule the depositions of the plaintiffs at a mutually agreeable time with due consideration to the schedules of all involved. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 4/11/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
February 18, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff Loiacono shall file, by 2/28/2014, an amended Response to the Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in compliance with the Local Rules, or the Statements therein may be deemed admitted. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 2/18/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
March 3, 2014 92 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 3/3/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)
March 3, 2014 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 64 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 3/3/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)
March 4, 2014 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Settlement Conference is set for 3/27/2014 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant. By 12:00 noon on Tuesday, 3/25/2014, Plaintiffs and Defendants shall deliver under seal, directly to Tina McDonald, Courtroom Deputy to the undersig ned, 797 United States Courthouse, 801 Broadway, Nashville, TN 37203, confidential settlement conference statements which shall specify their respective settlement positions. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 3/4/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
March 28, 2014 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Settlement Conference held on 3/27/2014. The parties did not agree to a settlement of the case. It appears that all pretrial deadlines have expired and no motions are currently pending. The undersigned Magistrate Judge certifies the case as ready for trial. The undersigned shall have no more duties in this case unless directed by the District Judge. The Clerk is directed to return this file to the District Judge. Judge Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 3/28/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huffnagle et al v. Loiacono
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Huffnagle
Represented By: Kristin J. Fecteau
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Hearn
Represented By: Kristin J. Fecteau
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reinhold Holtkamp
Represented By: Kristin J. Fecteau
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Hemrick
Represented By: Kristin J. Fecteau
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin W. Martin
Represented By: Kristin J. Fecteau
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Luartes
Represented By: Kristin J. Fecteau
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Loiacono
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]