Tannenbaum et al v. Federal Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Jerome S. Tannenbaum and Deborah M. Tannenbaum
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv01077
Filed: November 9, 2011
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Referring Judge: Juliet E. Griffin
Presiding Judge: John T. Nixon
 
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 24, 2013 103 Featured Case ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, FIC's Motion for Summary Judgment 54 is GRANTED to the extent that the Tannenbaums' claim for failure to adjust is DISMISSED and DENIED with respect to all other claims. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Senior Judge John T. Nixon on 6/24/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)
October 11, 2013 144 Featured Case ORDER: Daubert Hearing set for 10/16/2013, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Senior Judge John T. Nixon. Signed by Senior Judge John T. Nixon on 10/11/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)
October 22, 2013 158 Featured Case ORDER re 92 Motion in Limine. Accordingly, the Court DENIES the Motion to the extent that references to the costs of the hill stabilization will not be excluded from trial as irrelevant. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Senior Judge John T. Nixon on 10/22/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)
May 11, 2012 23 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 5/11/12. (af)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Tannenbaum et al v. Federal Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome S. Tannenbaum
Represented By: Timothy L. Warnock
Represented By: Gregory S. Reynolds
Represented By: Elizabeth O. Gonser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah M. Tannenbaum
Represented By: Elizabeth O. Gonser
Represented By: Gregory S. Reynolds
Represented By: Timothy L. Warnock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas McKay, III
Represented By: George Andrew Rowlett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]