Harris v. LNV Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Shirley Harris
Defendant: LNV Corporation, MGC Mortgage, Dovenmuehle Mortgage and Fictitious Defendants A, B, C
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00552
Filed: May 31, 2012
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Referring Judge: Joe Brown
Presiding Judge: Todd J. Campbell
 
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 16, 2012 23 Featured Case INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: A telephone conference with Magistrate Judge Brown to discuss case progress is set for March 5, 2013, at 11:00 a.m. To participate in the conference call, parties will call 615-695-2851 at the scheduled time. Amended P leadings due by 12/3/2012., Discovery due by 4/5/2013. Dispositive Motions due 4/6/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 10/16/12. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(afs) Modified on 10/16/2012 (afs).
June 1, 2012 4 Featured Case ORDER: In accordance with the Complaint (Docket No. 1) and Temporary Restraining Order (Docket No. 3) entered on May 31, 2012, the Court will hear Plaintiffs motion for Preliminary Injunction on June 13, 2012, at 9:00 a.m. Absent extraordinary circum stances, the hearing will conclude on that day. The parties shall file with the Court by the close of business on Monday, June 11, 2012, the following pertaining to the preliminary injunction hearing: (1) any affidavits; (2) witness lists; (3) exhibi t lists; (4) any depositions and/or deposition designations; (5) any stipulations; (6) any motions in limine; and (7) supplemental briefs. No witness shall testify live at the preliminary injunction hearing unless the party calling such witness to te stify has identified and made that witness available for a deposition prior to the hearing. The parties shall advise the courtroom deputy on or before the close of business on June 11, 2012, whether they have resolved matters by mutual agreement or if the preliminary injunction hearing is still necessary. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Chief Judge Todd J. Campbell on 6/1/12. (afs)
July 2, 2014 73 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Pending before the Court is a Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge (Docket No. 72 ), to which no Objections have been filed. The Court has reviewed the Report and Recommendation and the file . The Report and Recommendation is adopted and approved. Accordingly, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket No. 58 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as follows. Plaintiffs claims for negligence, unjust en richment, wrongful foreclosure, wantonness, and intentional infliction of emotional distress are DISMISSED. The remaining claims for violation of the Fair Debt Collection Practices Act, violation of the Tennessee Consumer Protection Act, slander of title, and breach of contract will be tried onSeptember 16, 2014, as previously scheduled (Docket No. 70 ). The pretrial conference remains set for September 8, 2014. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 7/2/14. (afs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Harris v. LNV Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Harris
Represented By: Charles W. Faquin
Represented By: Janet M. Okoye
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LNV Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MGC Mortgage
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dovenmuehle Mortgage
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fictitious Defendants A, B, C
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]