Clark v. Viacom, International, Inc. et al

Defendant: Viacom Media Networks, MTV Networks Enterprises, Inc., Jim Cantiello, John Does 1-20 and Viacom, International, Inc.
Plaintiff: Corey D. Clark
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00675
Filed: July 5, 2012
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Wilson
Presiding Judge: William J. Haynes
 
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 13, 2014 124 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 5/13/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Text Searchable Memo)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
March 26, 2013 67 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF THE COURT signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 3/26/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Text Searchable Memo)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
December 9, 2013 98 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 12/9/2013. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Clark v. Viacom, International, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Media Networks
Represented By: Jay Scott Bowen
Represented By: William V. Parsons, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTV Networks Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Jay Scott Bowen
Represented By: William V. Parsons, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Cantiello
Represented By: Jay Scott Bowen
Represented By: William V. Parsons, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-20
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom, International, Inc.
Represented By: William V. Parsons, III
Represented By: Jay Scott Bowen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey D. Clark
Represented By: James H. Freeman
Represented By: John R. Clemmons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]