Paschall v. CLK Multi-Family Management, LLC

Plaintiff: Rebecca Paschall
Defendant: CLK Multi-Family Management, LLC
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00789
Filed: July 31, 2012
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Todd J. Campbell
Referring Judge: E. Clifton Knowles
 
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 29:2611
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 20, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference 15 is granted. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2012 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 9/20/12. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
November 13, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2012 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 11/13/12. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
November 16, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Joint Notice of Pending Settlement and Motion to Continue Initial Case Management Conference 21 is Granted in part. Initial Case Management Conference is continued to 1/15/2013 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 11/16/12. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
August 1, 2012 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management. Discovery is not stayed absent order of the District Judge. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Judge. Signed by Chief Judge Todd J. Campbell on 8/1/12. (dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Paschall v. CLK Multi-Family Management, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Paschall
Represented By: Dewey Russell Thomas
Represented By: Kerry E. Knox
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLK Multi-Family Management, LLC
Represented By: Yvonne Maddalena
Represented By: Oscar J. Norris, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]