Harvill v. Harvill et al

Movant: Keith L. Grayson
Plaintiff: Catherine Evans Harvill
Defendant: F. Evans Harvill and Regions Bank
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00807
Filed: August 6, 2012
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
Referring Judge: E. Clifton Knowles
Presiding Judge: John T. Nixon
 
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 29, 2014 113 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: For the foregoing reasons, the undersigned recommends that Plaintiff's "Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint" 69 be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 1/29/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)
January 31, 2014 115 Featured Case ORDER: Without expressing any opinion as to the merits of Mr. Harvill's pending Motion for Summary Judgment, the Court believes this is an appropriate case to stay discovery pending the resolution of that Motion. Therefore, discovery is STAYED pending the resolution of Defendant Harvill's Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 1/31/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)
January 31, 2014 119 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 103 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 1/31/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)
August 31, 2012 44 Featured Case ORDER granting 42 Motion for Leave to Appear Keith Grayson. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 8/31/12. (dt)
March 27, 2013 61 Featured Case ORDER: Because his participation is not necessary to accord complete relief to the existing parties on the claims currently before the Court, and because he has claimed no interest in the subject matter of this case, the Court finds that Mr. McKiev er is not a necessary party under either Rule 19(a)(l)(A) or (B). Accordingly, Defendant Harvill's Motion to Dismiss 40 is DENIED. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Senior Judge John T. Nixon on 3/27/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Harvill v. Harvill et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Keith L. Grayson
Represented By: Helen Sfikas Rogers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Evans Harvill
Represented By: Siew-Ling Shea
Represented By: Helen Sfikas Rogers
Represented By: Keith L. Grayson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Evans Harvill
Represented By: William L. Harbison
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Holt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regions Bank
Represented By: Rebecca Brinkley
Represented By: Marcus M. Crider
Represented By: Lea C. Owen
Represented By: Joseph A. Woodruff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]