Zander et al v. Katz, Sapper & Miller, LLP et al

Plaintiff: Jeffrey J. Zander and JJZ Insurance Agency
Defendant: Katz, Sapper & Miller, LLP, KSM Business Services, Inc. and Andrew J. Manchir
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00967
Filed: September 19, 2012
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Referring Judge: Joe Brown
Presiding Judge: Kevin H. Sharp
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 27, 2012 11 Featured Case INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 11/1/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 12/2/2013. Telephone Conference set for 6/10/2013 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. To participate in the conference call, parties will call 615-695-28 51 at the scheduled time. After consulting with Judge Sharps courtroom deputy, this matter is set for trial on 5/6/2014 at 9:00 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 4/14/2014 at 1:30 PM before District Judge Kevin H. Sharp. Judge Sharp will issue a separate order covering his requirements for the final pretrial conference and the trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 11/20/12. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
June 3, 2014 177 Featured Case ORDER: The 162 Motion to file a reply is DENIED. Out of an abundance of caution, 172 will be placed under seal. The motion 175 is GRANTED to that extent. Motion for oral argument in the matter 174 is GRANTED and the matter is set for oral argument on Thursday, June 5, 2014, at 1:30 p.m., Courtroom 783. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 6/3/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)
June 6, 2014 180 Featured Case ORDER: Defendants motion to supplement 162 is GRANTED only in part. Any supplement to the expert report shall be filed on or before June 16, 2014. In accord with Local Rule 16.01(f)(2), motions for review of this order may be filed on or before June 13, 2014. The party opposing any such motion may have until June 20, 2014 to respond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 6/6/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)
June 13, 2014 183 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 6/13/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)
June 13, 2014 184 Featured Case ORDER: For the reasons explained in the accompanying Memorandum, the Court DENIES Defendant Katz, Sapper & Miller, LLP's motion for summary judgment (Docket No. 69); DENIES Defendants' motion for partial summary judgment (Docket No. 97); DENIES Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment (Docket No. 71); and DENIES Plaintiffs' motion to strike (Docket No. 88). It is SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 6/13/14. (af)
July 15, 2014 225 Featured Case JUDGMENT: IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE VERDICT OF THE JURY, RENDERED ON JULY 10, 2014, JUDGMENT IS HEREBY ENTERED IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFFS JEFFREY J. ZANDER AND JJZ INSURANCE AGENCY. Signed by Angie Brewer, Deputy Clerk, on 7/15/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)
July 15, 2014 226 Featured Case AMENDED JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE. Signed by Angie Brewer, Courtroom Deputy, on 7/15/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)
September 12, 2013 45 Featured Case STIPULATION AND AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 9/12/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
October 30, 2013 64 Featured Case ORDER: Telephone Conference held on 10/29/2013. The discovery and dispositive motion deadlines shall both be 1/10/2014. Responses to any dispositive motions shall be due 21 days after the motions, and replies, if any, limited to five pages, will be due seven days after the response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 10/30/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Zander et al v. Katz, Sapper & Miller, LLP et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey J. Zander
Represented By: George H. Nolan
Represented By: Eugene N. Bulso, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JJZ Insurance Agency
Represented By: George H. Nolan
Represented By: Eugene N. Bulso, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katz, Sapper & Miller, LLP
Represented By: Tim Edwards
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KSM Business Services, Inc.
Represented By: Tim Edwards
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew J. Manchir
Represented By: Tim Edwards
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]