Fleetone Factoring, LLC v. International Air Cargo, LLC et al

Defendant: Jim Davis, Giorgio A. Petrucci and International Air Cargo, LLC
Plaintiff: Fleetone Factoring, LLC
Case Number: 3:2012cv01079
Filed: October 19, 2012
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Negotiable Instrument
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 11, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court DENIAL OF DEFAULT. Signed by Keith Throckmorton Clerk of Court on 2/11/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
February 12, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Second MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference 15 is Granted. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/15/2013 at 2:15 PM before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 2/12/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
February 20, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY OF DEFAULT: The Clerk hereby enters default pursuant to FRCP 55(a) against Defendant Giorgio Petrucci. This is an entry of default only. No default judgment will be granted except upon further motion pursuant to FRCP 55(b). Signed by Unassigned on 2/20/13. (xc: Defendant Giorgio Petrucci by regular mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
April 15, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/15/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
July 29, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT: Judgment by default is entered in favor of Fleetone Factoring, LLC against Mr. Giorgio A. Petrucci in the amount of $1,046,562.40 plus post judgment interest at the rate established by law. Defendant may seek attorney fees a nd costs pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(d)(2) and taxable costs pursuant to Local Rule 54.01(a). Signed by Keith Throckmorton, Clerk of Court on 7/29/13. (xc: Giorgio A. Petrucci by regular mail). (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(la)
July 30, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT: Judgment by default is entered in favor of Fleetone Factoring, LLC against Mr. Giorgio A. Petrucci in the amount of $1,046,562.40 plus post judgment interest at the rate established by law. Defendant may seek attorney fees a nd costs pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(d) (2) and taxable costs pursuant to Local Rule 54.01(a). Signed by Keith Throckmorton Clerk of Court on 7/30/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(la)
August 1, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF PARTIAL VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: Plaintiff FleetOne Factoring, LLC ("Fleet One") has given notice of voluntary dismissal without prejudice of the action against Defendants International Air Cargo, LLC and Jim Davis, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). IT IS THEREFORE Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that Plaintiff Fleet One's claims against Defendants International Air Cargo, LLC and Jim Davis are dismissed, without prejudice. Fleet One's claims against Defendant Giorgio A. Petrucci are not affected by this notice. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/1/13. (la)
December 12, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference 8 is Granted. Initial Case Management Conference is reset for 2/14/2013 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 12/12/12. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fleetone Factoring, LLC v. International Air Cargo, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Davis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giorgio A. Petrucci
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Air Cargo, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fleetone Factoring, LLC
Represented By: Alexandra T. MacKay
Represented By: Garry K. Grooms
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]