R & L Merchandise, LLC v. Alex and Ani, LLC

Plaintiff: R & L Merchandise, LLC
Defendant: Alex and Ani, LLC
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv01081
Filed: October 19, 2012
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Todd J. Campbell
Referring Judge: Juliet E. Griffin
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 30, 2014 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: By 8/1/2014, the parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal and proposed order of dismissal. The Clerk is directed to forward the file in this case to the Honorable Todd J. Campbell for his consideration of the parties' stipulatio n of dismissal and proposed order of dismissal to be filed no later than August 1, 2014. Unless otherwise directed by the Court or upon motion of the parties, there will be no further proceedings before the Magistrate Judge in this case. Judge Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 7/30/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
December 26, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 Motion for Leave to file opposition to plaintiff's motion for leave to amend. The defendant filed its response 23 to the plaintiff's motion to amend the complaint 21 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 12/26/12. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
June 4, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 6/4/2013. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: R & L Merchandise, LLC v. Alex and Ani, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R & L Merchandise, LLC
Represented By: Randall W. Burton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex and Ani, LLC
Represented By: Daniel P. Berexa
Represented By: Richard M. Garbarini
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]