Jackson v. O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc.

Plaintiff: Robert S. Jackson
Defendant: O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv01215
Filed: November 26, 2012
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Cannon
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 18, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL: Jury Trial set for 4/22/2014 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Pretrial Conference set for 4/18/2014 at 1:30 PM before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Exhibit List and Witness List due by 4/15/2014. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/15/2014. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/18/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
September 30, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order. Discovery deadline extended to 11/15/2013. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/30/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
March 12, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/12/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
April 2, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 Motion for Extension of time for Plaintiff to Exchange Information. Extension to 4/4/2014. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/2/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
January 18, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Motion to Amend Pleadings due by 7/15/2013. Discovery due by 10/15/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 12/15/2013. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/18/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert S. Jackson
Represented By: Kerry E. Knox
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel W. Olivas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]