Baker et al v. JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A. et al

Defendant: Merscorp, Wilson & Associates LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A., Chase Home Finance LLC and Shellie Wallace
Plaintiff: Deryl L. Baker and Sheri L. Baker
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv01222
Filed: November 26, 2012
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Referring Judge: E. Clifton Knowles
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
 
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal- Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 6, 2014 100 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: For the foregoing reasons, the undersigned recommends that Defendants Motions to Dismiss (Docket Nos. 52 , 54 , 58 ) be GRANTED, and that this action be DISMISSED.. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 5/6/14. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (afs)
June 9, 2014 108 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: For the reasons stated herein, the plaintiff's Objections are OVERRULED and, subject to the clarifications set forth herein, the Magistrate Judges 4/30/14 R&R and 5/6/14 R&R are hereby ACCEPTED and made the findings of f act and conclusions of this court. The Clerk is directed to term all pending motions on the docket. The plaintiff's claims are hereby DISMISSED. Entry of this Order shall constitute judgment in the case. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/9/14. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(afs)
September 23, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: On August 6, 2013, the Magistrate Judge issued a Report and Recommendation (Docket No. 34 ), to which no timely objections have been filed. The Report and Recommendation is therefore ACCEPTED and made the findings of fact and conclusions of law of this court. For the reasons expressed therein, it is hereby ORDERED that the Plaintiffs Motion to Remand to State Court (Docket No. 12 ) is DENIED. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/23/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(afs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Baker et al v. JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merscorp
Represented By: Lauren Paxton Roberts
Represented By: John R. Wingo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilson & Associates LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Lauren Paxton Roberts
Represented By: John R. Wingo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A.
Represented By: John R. Wingo
Represented By: Lauren Paxton Roberts
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Home Finance LLC
Represented By: Lauren Paxton Roberts
Represented By: John R. Wingo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shellie Wallace
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deryl L. Baker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheri L. Baker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]