Reval Financial NPL, LLC v. Mukherji

Plaintiff: Reval Financial NPL, LLC
Defendant: Ashoke Mukherji
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00048
Filed: January 22, 2013
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Williamson
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 11, 2013 16 Featured Case DEFAULT JUDGMENT: Motion for Default Judgment 10 is Granted. Defendant has been served and has not filed a response within the time period required by law. Default was entered pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(a) on 3/15/2013 7 . T he prerequisites for default judgment have been met. Accordingly, Default Judgment is entered as to Defendant Ashoke Mukherji in the amount of $126,202.35, with post-judgment interest at the statutory rate stated in 28 U.S.C. § 1961. Atto rney fees and costs must be sought from the Court pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(d) and taxable costs of the case may be sought pursuant to Local Rule 54.0l(a). Signed by Vicki Kinkade, Chief Deputy on 4/11/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
April 26, 2013 23 Featured Case ORDER: The plaintiff's Motion For Attorney's Fees And Costs (Docket No. 22) is GRANTED. The Promissory Note in question provides for the payment of attorney's fees and costs, and the court finds the request reasonable and proper. It is therefore ORDERED that the plaintiff is AWARDED attorney's fees, expenses and costs in the total amount of $4,683.50, to be recovered from the defendant, Ashoke Mukherji. It is so ORDERED. ENTER this 26th day of April 2013. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/26/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(af)
July 18, 2013 32 Featured Case ORDER granting 27 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 7/18/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(la)
September 23, 2013 43 Featured Case ORDER: The Magistrate Judge has filed a Certification of Facts Regarding Possible Contempt (Docket No. 40 ) that is based on the failure of the defendant to fully answer some post-default judgment interrogatories. It is hereby ORDERED that, by September 30, 2013, the plaintiff shall edify this court as to the exact relief the plaintiff will be requesting, should this court hold the defendant in civil contempt. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/23/14. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(la)
March 12, 2014 61 Featured Case ORDER: Pursuant to the Court's direction, Plaintiff has filed a "Request for Sanctions for Civil Contempt" against Defendant. Docket No. 60. Defendant shall file a Response within ten (10) days of the entry of the instant Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 3/12/14. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.) (dt)
April 4, 2014 66 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Magistrate Judge Knowles recommends that Defendant be held in civil contempt. He has failed to comply with the following orders of the Court: (1) Order entered July 18, 2013 32 granting Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; and (2) Order entered October 1, 2013 47 requiring Defendant to pay Plaintiff's reasonable attorneys fees and expenses in the amount of $1,767. Additionally, Defendant failed to respond to two Motions for Orders to Show Cause 36 , 53 and he failed to attend two Show Cause Hearings, on September 12, 2013, and February 19, 2014. He also failed to respond to Plaintiff's "Request for Sanctions for Civil Contempt" 60 . The undersigned further recommends that a civil fi ne be imposed upon Defendantbeginning 10 days following the entry of the Court's Order finding Defendant in contempt, in the amount of $150 per day for a 30 day period. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 4/4/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Reval Financial NPL, LLC v. Mukherji
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reval Financial NPL, LLC
Represented By: Yousef A. Hamadeh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashoke Mukherji
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]