Clark v. E! Entertainment Television, Inc. et al

Defendant: Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, Morrison Foerester, Fox Inc., E! Entertainment Television International Holdings, LLC and E! Entertainment Television, Inc.
Plaintiff: Corey D. Clark
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00058
Filed: January 25, 2013
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Wilson
Referring Judge: E. Clifton Knowles
Presiding Judge: Kevin H. Sharp
 
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 10, 2014 100 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM signed by Chief Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 10/10/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
April 17, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Initial Case Management Conference is continued and will be reset by separate Order. This MOTION To Appear at 4-22-13 CMC by Telephone 14 is Denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 4/17/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
May 21, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 17 Amended Complaint. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff's "First Amended Complaint" (Docket No. 17)should be STRICKEN. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 5/21/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
May 23, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Motion to Dismiss 21 is Denied as Moot in view of Docket No. 23. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 5/23/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
December 2, 2013 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 72 Joint MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference and Maintain Stay on Discovery Pending District Court's Ruling on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Initial Case Management Conference is continued to 1/6/2014 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 12/2/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
February 3, 2014 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference is reset for 3/27/2014 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 2/3/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
March 13, 2014 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 81 Motion for Oral Argument Regaring Motions to Dismiss. The Court will hear oral argument on the pending motions to dismiss on Monday, 4/21/2014, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 3/13/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
March 14, 2014 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 46 Motion for Judicial Notice in support of Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 3/14/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
June 12, 2014 90 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 6/12/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
June 12, 2014 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum, the Motions to Dismiss filed by Defendants E! Entertainment Television, LLC and Fox Broadcasting Company 41 & 43 are hereby GRANTED and this case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk of the Court shall enter a final judgment in accordance with Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 6/12/14. (dt)
July 31, 2014 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 97 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 7/31/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Clark v. E! Entertainment Television, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gibson Dunn & Crutcher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morrison Foerester
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E! Entertainment Television International Holdings, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E! Entertainment Television, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey D. Clark
Represented By: Eugenia R. Grayer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]