Silvestro et al v. Bank of America, N.A.

Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Plaintiff: Darice E. Silvestro and Jeff Pate
Case Number: 3:2013cv00066
Filed: January 28, 2013
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Williamson
Presiding Judge: Todd J. Campbell
Referring Judge: E. Clifton Knowles
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 19, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 3/19/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)
March 19, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Pending before the Court is Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Docket No. 6). For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum, Defendants Motion is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiffs' claims for negligence and violation of the Tennessee Consumer Protection Act are DISMISSED. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 3/19/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)
July 25, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 7/25/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
July 25, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Pending before the Court is Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment 36 . For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum, Defendant's Motion is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiffs' claims for mental anguish and em otional distress are DISMISSED. This case remains set for a pretrial conference on October 10, 2014, and a trial on October 21, 2014. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 7/25/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
July 28, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court CORRECTED MEMORANDUM: Because of a clerical error, the Memorandum mistakenly filed at Docket No. 47 is hereby replaced with this Memorandum. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 7/28/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silvestro et al v. Bank of America, N.A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: J. Matthew Kroplin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darice E. Silvestro
Represented By: Jackson M. Welch, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Pate
Represented By: Jackson M. Welch, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]