American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania et al v. Cresent Enterprises, Inc.

Plaintiff: American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania and CNA Claimplus, Inc.
Defendant: Cresent Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00098
Filed: February 7, 2013
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Sumner
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 11, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Motion to Allow Out of State Counsel to Attend Initial Case Management Conference via Telephone. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/11/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
October 15, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 10/15/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
October 17, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 Motion to Seal information filed by Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 10/17/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(la)
November 13, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court REVISED AGREED CONFIENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 11/13/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
November 13, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Motion for a Qualified Protective Order 24 and Motion to Compel Discovery 25 are Denied as Moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 11/13/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
April 17, 2014 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Given the pendency of a Motion to Compel presently pending before Judge Knowles plus several pending motions before this judge, it is hereby ORDERED that the trial scheduled for June 3, 2014 and the pretrial conference scheduled for May 30, 2014 are CONTINUED, to be reset, if appropriate, after a decision on all pending motions. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/17/14. (dt)
April 18, 2014 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 54 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 4/18/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
August 28, 2014 81 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT re 43 Motion for Summary Judgment and 59 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/28/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)
August 28, 2014 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND JUDGMENT: The defendant's Motion to Strike the Affidavit of Cynthia Goral (Docket No. 59) is DENIED. The plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket No. 43) is GRANTED. The defendant's counterclaim is DISMISSED WIT H PREJUDICE. Counts Two and Three of the plaintiffs' Amended Complaint are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that judgment shall be entered for the plaintiffs in the amount of $84,247.00 in compensatory damages and $1 3,503.76 in contractual interest, as well as attorney's fees, subject to the court's review of a declaration to be filed by the plaintiffs accounting for their legal costs of collection. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/28/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania et al v. Cresent Enterprises, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania
Represented By: John E. Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CNA Claimplus, Inc.
Represented By: John E. Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cresent Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: William Lloyd Moore, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]