Olson v. Olson

Petitioner: Simona Oana Olson
Respondent: Oliver William Olson
Case Number: 3:2013cv00138
Filed: February 14, 2013
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Sumner
Referring Judge: Juliet E. Griffin
Presiding Judge: Kevin H. Sharp
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:11601 International Child Abduction Remedies Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 16, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 4/16/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
April 23, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Telephone conference held on 4/22/2013, at which time they advised that no issues have developed except that they encountered a delay in obtaining mental health records, but they believed that they had resolved the matter. The Clerk is dire cted to forward the file in this case to Judge Sharp prefatory to the 5/13/2013, pretrial conference and 5/21/2013, bench trial. Counsel agreed that there are no further matters to be addressed by the Magistrate Judge. Therefore, unless otherwise directed by the Court or upon motion of the parties, there will be no further proceedings before the Magistrate Judge in this case. Judge Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 4/23/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
May 15, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final pretrial conference was held on 5/13/13. For the reasons stated in open Court, it is hereby ORDERED that: Respondent's Motion in Limine for Children to Testify in Chambers 18 is hereby RESERVED for ruling at trial. Respondent 9;s Motion in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony on Hungarian Law 19 is hereby DENIED. Respondent's Motion in Limine to Permit Witness Testimony by Telephone [or Skype] 20 is hereby GRANTED. Respondent's Motion in Limine Objecting to and to Strike Proposed Expert Witness Dr. John Ciocca 22 is hereby DENIED AS MOOT. Respondent's Motion in Limine to Exclude Hungarian School Enrollment Records without Testimony of Custodian of Records 23 is hereby DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 5/15/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
June 6, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: A final pretrial conference was held in this matter on May 13, 2013, wherein the Court reserved ruling on Respondents Motion in Limine for Children to Testify in Chambers 18 . For the reasons stated in open Court during the bench trial, th e motion is hereby GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The motion is granted to the extent that the children are permitted to testify in chambers but denied with respect to one lawyer for each party being present during the testimony. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 6/6/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
October 30, 2013 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Within 14 days from the date of this Order, Respondent, Oliver William Olson, shall provide the Court with sufficient, sworn documentation regarding his current financial situation, particularly his unemployment. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 10/30/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
March 31, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 3/31/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(afs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olson v. Olson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Simona Oana Olson
Represented By: C. Suzanne Landers
Represented By: Lucie K. Brackin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Oliver William Olson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]