Hill v. R.R. Donnelly & Sons

Defendant: R.R. Donnelly & Sons
Plaintiff: Larry Hill
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00208
Filed: March 8, 2013
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Sumner
Referring Judge: John S. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Todd J. Campbell
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 3, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: In light of Defendant's withdrawal of its Motion to Dismiss, see Docket No. 21, p. 2, the Clerk is directed to term Defendants Motion 13 . Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 5/3/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
May 6, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Jury Trial set for 4/8/2014 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Pretrial Conference set for 3/31/2014 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Exhibit List and Witness List due by 3/24/2014. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/24/2014. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 5/6/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) Modified on 5/7/2013 (dt).
August 8, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff's counsel has filed a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Docket No. 28) because of Plaintiff's recent death. Accordingly, this action is DISMISSED, and the Clerk is directed to close the file. Any pending Motions are denied as moot. The pretrial conference set for March 31, 2014, and the jury trial set for April 8, 2014, are canceled. This Order shall constitute the final judgment in this case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 58. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 8/8/13. (la)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hill v. R.R. Donnelly & Sons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.R. Donnelly & Sons
Represented By: Andrew S. Naylor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Hill
Represented By: J. Daniel Marshall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]