Doughtie & Company, Inc. v. Rutherford County et al

Plaintiff: Doughtie & Company, Inc.
Defendant: Rutherford County, Rutherford County Probate Clerk's Office, Lisa Crowell, Tennessee Sixteenth Judicial District Clerk and Master's Office and John Bratcher
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00209
Filed: March 11, 2013
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Rutherford
Referring Judge: Joe Brown
Presiding Judge: Todd J. Campbell
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 7, 2013 20 Featured Case INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 5/7/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
May 8, 2013 21 Featured Case ORDER: Jury Trial set for 7/8/2014 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Pretrial Conference set for 6/30/2014 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Exhibit List and Witness List due by 6/23/2014. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/23/2014. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 5/8/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
August 5, 2013 32 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF THE COURT: Pending before the Court is an Application for Injunctive Relief (Docket No. 22 ) filed by the Plaintiff. The Application asks this Court to issue a preliminary injunction requiring Defendants to place The Rutherford Read er, a newspaper owned and operated by Plaintiff, on their respective lists of publications eligible to publish legal notices. For the reasons described, the Application is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 8/5/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(la)
August 22, 2013 37 Featured Case ORDER denying 34 Joint Motion to modify the Initial Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 8/22/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(la)
October 8, 2013 43 Featured Case ORDER: Pending before the Court is Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Docket No. 35 ). For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum, Defendants' Motion is GRANTED, and this action is DISMISSED. The pretrial confe rence set for June 30, 2014, and the jury trial set for July 8, 2014, are canceled. Any other pending Motions are denied as moot, and the Clerk is directed to close the file. This Order shall constitute the final judgment in this case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 58. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 10/8/13. (la)
March 11, 2013 4 Featured Case ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management. Discovery is not stayed absent order of the District Judge. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Judge. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 3/11/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Doughtie & Company, Inc. v. Rutherford County et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doughtie & Company, Inc.
Represented By: Barry R. Tidwell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rutherford County
Represented By: Edward Evan Cope
Represented By: James C. Cope
Represented By: Blake Allan Garner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rutherford County Probate Clerk's Office
Represented By: Edward Evan Cope
Represented By: James C. Cope
Represented By: Blake Allan Garner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Crowell
Represented By: Edward Evan Cope
Represented By: James C. Cope
Represented By: Blake Allan Garner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee Sixteenth Judicial District Clerk and Master's Office
Represented By: Edward Evan Cope
Represented By: James C. Cope
Represented By: Blake Allan Garner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Bratcher
Represented By: Edward Evan Cope
Represented By: James C. Cope
Represented By: Blake Allan Garner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]