Davis v. Wilson County, Tennessee

Defendant: Wilson County, Tennessee
Plaintiff: Harold B. Davis
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00238
Filed: March 18, 2013
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Wilson
Referring Judge: John S. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Todd J. Campbell
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 26, 2013 57 Featured Case ORDER denying 33 Motion To Deny Defendant's Second Motion to Dismiss as Untimely. Granting 38 Motion to Strike or Disregard. The Court shallnot consider matters outside the pleadings, particularly where those matters are factually disputed. Granting 43 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 7/26/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
March 5, 2014 69 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Magistrate Judge Bryant RECOMMENDS that defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 29 be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 3/5/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
March 27, 2014 74 Featured Case ORDER: Pending before the Court are a Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge 69 and Objections filed by the Defendant 70 . The Court has reviewed de novo the Report and Recommendation, the Objections, and the file. The Objections of t he Defendant are overruled, and the Report and Recommendation is adopted and approved. Accordingly, Defendant's Second Motion to Dismiss 29 is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 3/27/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
June 2, 2014 78 Featured Case ORDER: Jury Trial reset for 6/23/2015 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Pretrial Conference reset for 6/15/2015 at 1:00 PM before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Exhibit List and Witness List due by 6/8/2015. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/8/2015. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 6/2/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Davis v. Wilson County, Tennessee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilson County, Tennessee
Represented By: Michael Ray Jennings
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Thompson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold B. Davis
Represented By: Jerry Gonzalez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]