The Adam Group, Inc. of Middle Tennessee v. Tunnell et al

Defendant: Daniel Christopher Tunnell, Keagan Brown, Annie Tunnell McDaniel and Karl Dumas
Plaintiff: The Adam Group, Inc. of Middle Tennessee
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00258
Filed: March 20, 2013
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Referring Judge: E. Clifton Knowles
Presiding Judge: Kevin H. Sharp
 
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 13, 2013 21 Featured Case ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 5/13/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
May 15, 2013 23 Featured Case ORDER granting 19 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 5/15/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
May 21, 2013 24 Featured Case INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Motion to Amend Pleadings due by 12/29/2013. Discovery due by 3/31/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 8/1/2014. Jury Trial set for 12/9/2014 09:00 AM before District Judge Kevin H. Sharp. Pretrial Conference set for 1 1/17/2014 at 1:30 PM before District Judge Kevin H. Sharp. Telephone Conference set for 2/18/2014 at 9:30 AM. Counsel for plaintiff shall initiate this call. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 5/21/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
March 12, 2014 45 Featured Case ORDER granting 44 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 3/12/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
June 19, 2014 61 Featured Case MEMORANDUM. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 6/19/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
June 19, 2014 62 Featured Case ORDER: For the reasons explained in the accompanying Memorandum, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 9 is hereby DENIED. This case is returned to Magistrate Judge Knowles for further pretrial management and consideration of the outstanding discovery motions (Docket Nos. 33, 34, 35, 39, 40, 42, 48 & 55). Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 6/19/14. (dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: The Adam Group, Inc. of Middle Tennessee v. Tunnell et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Christopher Tunnell
Represented By: Brian M. Clark
Represented By: Craig L. Lowell
Represented By: David Murray Smythe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keagan Brown
Represented By: Brian M. Clark
Represented By: Craig L. Lowell
Represented By: David Murray Smythe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annie Tunnell McDaniel
Represented By: Brian M. Clark
Represented By: Craig L. Lowell
Represented By: David Murray Smythe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl Dumas
Represented By: Brian M. Clark
Represented By: Craig L. Lowell
Represented By: David Murray Smythe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Adam Group, Inc. of Middle Tennessee
Represented By: Eli J. Richardson
Represented By: Paige Waldrop Mills
Represented By: Joshua Ray Denton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]