Quality Manufacturing Systems, Inc. v. R/X Automation Solutions, Inc.

Plaintiff: Quality Manufacturing Systems, Inc.
Defendant: R/X Automation Solutions, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00260
Filed: March 21, 2013
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Rutherford
Presiding Judge: William J. Haynes
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 21, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 50 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 11/21/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
March 31, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 33 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 3/31/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)
September 30, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The Court finds that QMSI's cross-motion for partial summary judgment should be GRANTED. The Court finds, as a matter of law, the Pill Counter Agreement between the parties remains in effect and binding, and that RXAS' s announced intention to terminate the Agreement as of July 2013 violated the terms of the Agreement. All other issues in this case, including damages, are expressly reserved. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 9/30/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Quality Manufacturing Systems, Inc. v. R/X Automation Solutions, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quality Manufacturing Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua J. Phillips
Represented By: Robert S. Patterson
Represented By: Thomas P. Johnson
Represented By: Kyle W. Brenton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R/X Automation Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Theodore J. Finn
Represented By: Lauren Zehr Curry
Represented By: Samuel P. Funk
Represented By: Mark A. Herber
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]