Nevils v. State of Tennessee et al

Plaintiff: Gene Nevils
Defendant: Williamson County and State of Tennessee
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00261
Filed: March 21, 2013
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Williamson
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 21, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/21/2013. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
May 21, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Application to proceed in forma pauperis and Assessing Filing Fee for Gene Nevils. In accordance with the Memorandum contemporaneously entered, the complaint fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Consequently , this action is hereby DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/21/2013. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail & Sheriff of Williamson County by regular mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
August 29, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The undersigned recommends that the instant Motion to Amend Cases (Docket No. 21 ) should be DENIED, insofar as it pertains to the instant case. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 8/29/2013. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)
September 24, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: The Court discerns no basis for exercising jurisdiction over the plaintiff's Motion to Amend. Therefore, the Report and Recommendation, to the extent that it recommends that the Motion to Amend be deni ed, is ADOPTED and APPROVED. Accordingly, the plaintiffs Motion to Amend is hereby DENIED for want of jurisdiction. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/24/2013. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Nevils v. State of Tennessee et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Nevils
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williamson County
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Tennessee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]