Scruggs v. Bryson et al

Defendant: Michael Bryson
Plaintiff: Dennis Scruggs
Case Number: 3:2013cv00278
Filed: March 28, 2013
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Todd J. Campbell
Referring Judge: E. Clifton Knowles
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 19, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: This matter is before the Court upon a Motion to Dismiss, filed by Defendant Michael Bryson, the only remaining Defendant in this action. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), for failure to state a claim upon which rel ief can be granted. Docket No. 19 . In support of his Motion, Defendant has filed an accompanying Memorandum of Law. Docket No. 20 . For the foregoing reasons, the undersigned recommends that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Specifically, the undersigned recommends that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED with respect to Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment claims, but DENIED with respect to Plaintiff's First Amendment retaliation claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 7/19/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(la)
March 27, 2013 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The plaintiff is hereby GRANTED 30 days from the date of entry of this order on the docket in which to either pay the civil filing fee of $350.00 or submit an application to proceed in forma pauperis along with a certified copy of his i nmate trust account statement for the previous six month period. The Clerk will provide the plaintiff with a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis along with a copy of Administrative Order No. 93. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 3/27/13. (xc:Pro se party IFP Application and Adm. Order No. 93 by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 3/28/2013.]
August 12, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Pending before the Court are a Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge (Docket No. 25 ), Objections filed by the Defendant (Docket No. 27 ), Objections filed by the Plaintiff (Docket No. 35 ), and an Amendment to Objections fi led by Defendant (Docket No. 39 ). Accordingly, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Docket No. 19 ) is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment claims are dismissed. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 8/12/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(la)
September 6, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend 34 should be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 9/6/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
September 6, 2013 51 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The undersigned finds that there are no genuine issues as to any material fact and that Defendant is entitled to a judgment as a matter of law. Accordingly, the undersigned recommends that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 43 be GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 9/6/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
September 6, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The undersigned recommends that Plaintiff's "Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction" 31 should be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 9/6/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scruggs v. Bryson et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Bryson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Scruggs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]