Harmer et al v. Colom et al

Defendant: Wilbur O. Colom and The Colom Law Firm, LLC
Plaintiff: Peter S. Harmer and Christine C. Harmer
Case Number: 3:2013cv00286
Filed: April 1, 2013
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Williamson
Referring Judge: E. Clifton Knowles
Presiding Judge: Kevin H. Sharp
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 10, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, the instant Motions (Docket Nos. 17, 37, 42, and 45) are DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 10/10/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)
February 21, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: This matter is before the Court upon "Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendants' Motion for Telephonic Hearing 39 ." Docket No. 42 (underlining in original). The Court has denied as moot the Motion for Telephonic Hearing. Docket No. 56 . Therefore, the instant Motion to Strike is also DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 2/21/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
March 13, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Based upon the foregoing, the Court rules as follows: (1) Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Docket Nos. 5, 30, 33 & 35) and their Motion to Stay Discovery and Initial Disclosures (Docket No. 43) are hereby DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (2) Pl aintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment (Docket No. 19) is hereby DENIED; (3) Within thirty (30) days of the date of entry of this Order, local counsel shall file an appearance on behalf of Defendants, although William Colom can represent himsel f if he chooses to do so. If Scott Colum intends to continue to represent Defendants he shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and a Certificate of Good Standing, and shall pay the appropriate fee; (4) Within twenty (20) days of the date of app earance of new counsel, Defendants shall plead or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint; and (5) Plaintiffs' Motion to Ascertain Status (Docket No. 48) is hereby DENIED AS MOOT; This case is hereby returned to Magistrate Judge Knowles for further pretrial case management. It is SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 3/13/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)
May 23, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 4 Motion for User Name and Password. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 5/23/13. (xc:Pro se party by email.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) Modified Text on 5/23/2013 (dt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harmer et al v. Colom et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilbur O. Colom
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Colom Law Firm, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter S. Harmer
Represented By: Larry E. Parrish
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine C. Harmer
Represented By: Larry E. Parrish
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]