Schenck et al v. Orosz et al

Plaintiff: Russell Schenck and Bethany Primrose
Defendant: Cale Orosz and Case Doodle, LLC
Case Number: 3:2013cv00294
Filed: April 2, 2013
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 20, 2015 146 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/20/2015. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
May 20, 2015 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum, the plaintiffs' Motion for Contempt (Docket No. 114 ) and Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket No. 116 ) are DENIED. The parties shall serve or file supplemental submissions in accordance with the deadlines set forth in the Memorandum. The Order Setting Case for Trial (Docket No. 74 ) is hereby VACATED and the trial date is hereby CONTINUED pending further order of the court. All other case management deadlines, other than those set forth in the accompanying Memorandum, and hereby CONTINUED pending further order of the court. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/20/2015. (hb)
July 9, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 42 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/9/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
November 7, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/7/2013. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
April 11, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference 4 is Granted. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 6/17/2013 at 1:45 PM before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/11/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
March 17, 2014 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: By March 24, 2014, the parties shall file a revised expanded Preliminary Injunction, the wording for which they agree upon. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/17/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schenck et al v. Orosz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Schenck
Represented By: James Harold Harris, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bethany Primrose
Represented By: James Harold Harris, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cale Orosz
Represented By: Richard G. Sanders, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Case Doodle, LLC
Represented By: Richard G. Sanders, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.