Strange et al v. City of Springfield, Tennessee et al

Defendant: Christopher Berry, City of Springfield, Tennessee, Andrew Cobb and Ricki Heatherly
Plaintiff: Jerry Strange and Candice Strange
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00308
Filed: April 4, 2013
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Robertson
Presiding Judge: Todd J. Campbell
Referring Judge: Juliet E. Griffin
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 21, 2013 15 Featured Case INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 5/21/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
May 21, 2013 16 Featured Case INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No. 2: Telephone Conference set for 11/1/2013 at 10:00 AM to be initiated by plaintiffs' counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 5/21/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
July 29, 2013 18 Featured Case ORDER: Counsel for the parties called the Court on July 24, 2013. Deadline for the defendants to file responses to the plaintiff's complaint and for the parties to serve initial disclosures in accord with Rule 26(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure is extended to August 12, 2013. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 7/29/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(la)
March 25, 2014 27 Featured Case ORDER: The parties have filed a Stipulation of Dismissal 26 , indicating that all matters in dispute herein have been resolved. Accordingly, this action is DISMISSED with prejudice, and the Clerk is directed to close the file. Any pending Motions a re denied as moot. The pretrial conference set for November 10, 2014, and the jury trial set for November 18, 2014, are canceled. This Order shall constitute the final judgment in this case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 58. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 3/25/14. (dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Strange et al v. City of Springfield, Tennessee et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Berry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Springfield, Tennessee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Cobb
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricki Heatherly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Strange
Represented By: Dominick R. Smith
Represented By: David Randolph Smith
Represented By: William Lyon Chadwick, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candice Strange
Represented By: David Randolph Smith
Represented By: William Lyon Chadwick, Jr.
Represented By: Dominick R. Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]