Doe et al v. Rutherford County, Tennessee, Board of Education

Plaintiff: Mary Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe
Defendant: Rutherford County, Tennessee, Board of Education
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00328
Filed: April 11, 2013
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Rutherford
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 20:1681 Title IX of Education Amendment of 1972
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 5, 2014 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 62 Motion to Ascertain Status of Ruling on 62 Motion to Quash, denying 103 Motion to Strike, and granting 105 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response - Response due 8/8/2014. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/5/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ds)
August 6, 2014 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 109 Motion to Strike and granting 110 Motion for Leave to Accept Late Responses. The clerk is directed to strike the entry at Docket No. 107 and to seal the entry. The court will treat the document filed under seal at Docket No. 108 as the operative set of plaintiffs' responses to the defendants asserted facts. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/6/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ds)
August 18, 2014 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 59 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 8/18/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)
August 18, 2014 117 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT re 77 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/18/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)
July 26, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL: Jury Trial set for 9/30/2014 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Pretrial Conference set for 9/26/2014 at 1:30 PM before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Exhibit List and Witness List due by 9/23/2013. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/23/2013. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/26/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
April 24, 2014 72 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: For the reasons stated below, Plaintiffs' Motion to Quash 45 is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 4/24/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
May 27, 2014 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 75 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation on Memorandum of Law. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/27/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Doe et al v. Rutherford County, Tennessee, Board of Education
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Doe
Represented By: Kerry E. Knox
Represented By: Amy J. Farrar
Represented By: Kerry E. Knox
Represented By: Amy J. Farrar
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Kerry E. Knox
Represented By: Amy J. Farrar
Represented By: Kerry E. Knox
Represented By: Amy J. Farrar
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Kerry E. Knox
Represented By: Amy J. Farrar
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rutherford County, Tennessee, Board of Education
Represented By: David Randall Mantooth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]