Wahl v. General Electric Company et al

Plaintiff: Marye Wahl
Defendant: GE Healthcare, GE Healthcare AS, General Electric Company and GE Healthcare, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00329
Filed: April 11, 2013
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 23, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE: Tor A. Hoerman is hereby admitted to practice in this case pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff herein. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/23/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
April 23, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE: Eric M. Terry is hereby admitted to practice in this case pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff herein. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/23/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
April 26, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF HEIDI LEVINE. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/26/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
June 17, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL: Jury Trial set for 12/2/2014 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Pretrial Conference set for 11/24/2014 at 1:30 PM before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Exhibit List and Witness List due by 11/19/2014. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/19/2014. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/17/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
November 14, 2013 69 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/14/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)
November 14, 2013 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum, the defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket No. 35) is GRANTED. The plaintiff's claims are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Entry of this Order shall constitute judgment in the case. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/14/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Wahl v. General Electric Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marye Wahl
Represented By: Eric M. Terry
Represented By: Tor A. Hoerman
Represented By: R. Christopher Gilreath
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE Healthcare
Represented By: Christopher M. Strongosky
Represented By: Heidi L. Levine
Represented By: Matthew J. Evans
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE Healthcare AS
Represented By: Christopher M. Strongosky
Represented By: Heidi L. Levine
Represented By: Matthew J. Evans
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Christopher M. Strongosky
Represented By: Heidi L. Levine
Represented By: Matthew J. Evans
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Evans
Represented By: Heidi L. Levine
Represented By: Christopher M. Strongosky
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]