Harris v. Cotter et al

Defendant: Elizabeth Gail Debusk, Angela Cotter and Empact Medical Services, Inc. SIMPLE IRA PLAN
Plaintiff: Seth D. Harris
Case Number: 3:2013cv00339
Filed: April 15, 2013
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Rutherford
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 16 Motion for Entry of Default. The motion is denied as Plaintiff has not provided an adequate Declaration of Military Service as required by the Servicemembers Civil Relief Act of 2003 (50 App. U.S.C. 501 et seq.) Plaintiff may file a renewed request for default when the required Declaration is provided. Signed by Keith Throckmorton, Clerk of Court on 10/17/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(la)
October 23, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 11/7/2013 at 3:15 PM before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/23/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
June 18, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The parties shall immediately confer and file a joint mediation report, as required by Judge Trauger in all cases. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/18/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
July 19, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Motion. The Initial Case Management Conference is reset for 8/23/13 at 4:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/19/13. (la)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Cotter et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Gail Debusk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Cotter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empact Medical Services, Inc. SIMPLE IRA PLAN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seth D. Harris
Represented By: Brooke D. Werner
Represented By: Robert M. Lewis, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]