Gibbs v. Corrections Corporation of America et al

Defendant: Amber Bass, Mercedes R. Jones, Cecile N. Casey, Daniel Pritchard, Corrections Corporation of America, Kayla Perry Lineberry, John Does, Stephen Pain, Carolyn Jordan and L. Staggs
Plaintiff: Michael T. Gibbs, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00350
Filed: April 17, 2013
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Referring Judge: Joe Brown
Presiding Judge: Todd J. Campbell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 5, 2014 125 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The undersigned RECOMMENDS that both motions for summary judgment (DE 111, 120) be GRANTED and that Plaintiffs claims against Defendants Jordan, Pritchard, Casey, Jones, Lineberry, Payne, Bass, and Staggs, be DISMISSED w ith prejudice, but that the claims against the John Doe Defendants be DISMISSED without prejudice. The Magistrate Judge further RECOMMENDS that any appeal NOT BE CERTIFIED as taken in good faith pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3). Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 8/5/2014. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)
August 28, 2014 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Pending before the Court is a Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge (Docket No. 125 ), to which no Objections have been filed. The Court has reviewed the Report and Recommendation and the file . The Report and Recommendation is adopted and approved. Accordingly, the Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Jordan (Docket No. 111 ) and the Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Pritchard, Casey, Jones, Lineberry, Payne, Ba ss and Staggs (Docket No. 120 ) are GRANTED, and this action is DISMISSED with prejudice, except Plaintiff's claims against the John Doe Defendants are DISMISSED without prejudice. Any other pending Motions are denied as moot, and the Clerk i s directed to close the file. The pretrial conference set for November 7, 2014, and the jury trial set for November 18, 2014, are canceled. This Order shall constitute the final judgment in this case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 58. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 8/28/2014. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(eh)
April 17, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 4/17/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(rd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibbs v. Corrections Corporation of America et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber Bass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes R. Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cecile N. Casey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Pritchard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrections Corporation of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kayla Perry Lineberry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Pain
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Jordan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Staggs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael T. Gibbs, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]