Liberty v. Nashville Senior Care, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Patricia Liberty
Defendant: Nashville Senior Care, LLC and Health Services Management Group
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00369
Filed: April 22, 2013
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Referring Judge: Joe Brown
Presiding Judge: Kevin H. Sharp
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Telephone conference held on 3/17/2014. Expert discovery may remainopen until the close of all discovery on 6/27/2014. Plaintiff may file a motion to amend the complaint, accompanied by the actual amended complaint, no later than two weeks after the Defendant has made their Rule 26 expertdisclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 3/18/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
June 6, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 6/10/2014 at 3:00 PM, to discuss extending discovery deadlines. Counsel should submit a brief summary of their concerns to the undersigned at brownchambers@tnmd.uscourts.gov by Monday, June 9th. To participate in the conference call, parties will call 615-695-2851 at the scheduled time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 6/6/14. (dt)
June 12, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Telephone conference held on 6/10/2014. Discovery deadline extended to 8/29/2014. Pretrial Conference reset for 10/24/2014 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Kevin H. Sharp. Judge Sharp will issue a separate order concerning his requirement s for the final pretrial conference and the trial, which will include deadlines for Daubert motions and motions in limine, among other things. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 6/12/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
April 24, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Aleta A. Trauger recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Kevin H. Sharp for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/24/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
April 30, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: This case has now been referred to the undersigned for case management 6 . The initial case management conference set before Judge Trauger is CANCELED. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 6/25/2013 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Ju dge Joe Brown. The Clerk will furnish the parties with the standard order setting the initial case management conference before me. The parties should note that my requirements are slightly different from those of Judge Trauger. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 4/30/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Liberty v. Nashville Senior Care, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Liberty
Represented By: Joseph K. Dughman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nashville Senior Care, LLC
Represented By: Leon Carl Hagwood
Represented By: David M. Eaton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Services Management Group
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]