Mihnovich et al v. Williamson County Board of Education et al

Plaintiff: N.M., Tracy Mihnovich and James Mihnovich
Defendant: Williamson County Board of Education and John Does 1-31
Case Number: 3:2013cv00379
Filed: April 24, 2013
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Williamson
Presiding Judge: Todd J. Campbell
Referring Judge: Juliet E. Griffin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 21, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Pending before the Court is Plaintiffs' Motion for F.E.R.P.A. Hearing to Acquire Student Information 19 . The Motion is referred to the Magistrate Judge for determination. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 2/21/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
March 5, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Counsel for the parties shall convene another telephone conference call with the Court on Friday, March 7, 2014, at 1:00 p.m., to be initiated by plaintiffs' counsel, to address whether the parties have reached a resolution relating to the plaintiffs' motion, to schedule a hearing, if appropriate, to address whether the plaintiffs plan to dismiss the John Doe defendants, and any other appropriate matters. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 3/5/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
March 14, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Having reviewed the defendant's notice of compliance 29 , the FERPA hearing, scheduled by order entered March 7, 2014 28 , on March 27, 2014, is CANCELLED. However, counsel for the parties shall convene a telephone conference call with the Court at the same time--Thursday, March 27, 2014, at 1:00 p.m.--to be initiated by defendant's counsel, to address the plaintiffs' motion to amend scheduling order to enlarge deadline for leave to amend complaint 25 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 3/14/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
May 8, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court deems the agreed order to be a stipulation of dismissal and, as such, no further action on the part of the Court is required in accord with Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Therefore, the plaintiffs clai ms against defendants John Does 1-31 are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice and the Clerk is directed to terminate John Does 1-31 as defendants in this case. John Does 1-31 terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 5/8/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
April 24, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management. Discovery is not stayed absent order of the District Judge. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Judge. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 4/24/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
August 29, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 40 Motion for Summary Judgment. The plaintiffs shall have until September 26, 2014, to file a response to the motion. Any reply, if necessary, shall be filed within 14 days after the filing of the response or by October 10, 2014, if the r esponse is filed on September 26, 2014. No other filings in support of or in opposition to any dispositive motion shall be made after October 10, 2014, except with the express permission of the Honorable Todd J. Campbell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 8/29/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)
November 3, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 11/3/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mihnovich et al v. Williamson County Board of Education et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.M.
Represented By: Larry Lamont Crain
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Mihnovich
Represented By: Larry Lamont Crain
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Mihnovich
Represented By: Larry Lamont Crain
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williamson County Board of Education
Represented By: Lisa M. Carson
Represented By: Lee A. Thompson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-31
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]