Morris v. Genspring Family Offices, LLC et al

Defendant: Genspring Family Offices, LLC and SunTrust Banks, Inc.
Plaintiff: John Morris
Case Number: 3:2013cv00389
Filed: April 26, 2013
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Referring Judge: John S. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Kevin H. Sharp
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 29, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER: Defendants shall provide to Plaintiff's counsel their complete discovery responses, along with responsive documents, by the close of business on August 16, 2013, and that any confidential documents will be produced by Defendants by the latter of August 16, 2013 or this Court's entry of a protective order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 7/29/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(la)
August 16, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 8/16/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(la)
May 21, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Due to calendar conflict, the bench trial set for June 24, 2014, is hereby reset for Tuesday, November 4, 2014, at 9:00 a.m. The final pretrial conference set for June 9, 2014, is reset for Monday, October 20, 2014, at 2:30 p.m. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 5/21/14. (tmw)
June 13, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 6/13/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
June 13, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: For the reasons explained in the accompanying Memorandum, the Court DENIES summary judgment as to whether Plaintiff's right to a single incentive award was contingent on his following Defendant's administrative process to trigger such a payment, but GRANTS summary judgment as to all other issues. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 6/13/14. (dt)
June 3, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference is reset for 6/26/2013 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 6/3/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. Genspring Family Offices, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genspring Family Offices, LLC
Represented By: Alonda W. McCutcheon
Represented By: Lourdes L. Cromwell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunTrust Banks, Inc.
Represented By: Alonda W. McCutcheon
Represented By: Lourdes L. Cromwell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Morris
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]