Hall v. Ramdev Ji, LLC

Defendant: Ramdev Ji, LLC
Plaintiff: Brandon Hall
Case Number: 3:2013cv00409
Filed: April 30, 2013
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12131 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 15, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Pursuant to Rule 41 F.R.Civ.P. and as evidenced by the signature of counsel below, Plaintiff Brandon Hall and Defendant Ramdev Ji, LLC, submit this Agreed Order of Dismissal with Prejudice and request ent ry of such dismissal, with each party bearing their own costs and attorney fees. ACCORDINGLY, it is hereby Ordered that Plaintiff's Complaint against Ramdev Ji, LLC, is dismissed with prejudice with each party bearing their own costs and attorney fees. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/15/13. (la)
July 19, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: This case is of one five separate lawsuits that have been consolidated into a lead case, Hall v. Ramdev Ji, LLC, No. 3:13-cv-00409 ("Lead Case"). In this case (hereinafter, "Hillsboro"), Defendant Hillsboro Plaza Retail Partners I, LLC ("Hillsboro") has filed a Motion to Dismiss. Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) (Hillsboro Docket No. 10 ), to which the plaintiff, Brandon Hall, filed a Response in opposition (Hillsboro Docket No. 15 ). For the reasons stated he rein, the Motion to Dismiss will be denied. After considering the evidence, the court agrees with Hall's position that judgment at this stage is not warranted. However, for the reasons stated herein, discovery is warranted, and Hillsboro 9;s motion under Rule 12(b)(1) is hereby DENIED. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/17/13. (Entered: 07/17/2013). Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/17/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(la)
July 26, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The court has been notified that this case has settled. It is hereby ORDERED that a stipulation of dismissal or other settlement document shall be filed within 20 days of the entry of this Order. The initial case management conference on August 16, 2013 as to this case is CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/26/13. Associated Member Case: 3:13-0508(dt)
July 26, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The court has been notified that this case has settled. It is hereby ORDERED that a stipulation of dismissal or other settlement document shall be filed within twenty (20) days of the entry of this Order. The initial case management conference on August 16, 2013 as to this case is CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/26/13. Associated Member Case: 3:13-0509.(dt)
July 26, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The court has been notified that this case has settled. It is hereby ORDERED that a stipulation of dismissal or other settlement document shall be filed within 20 days of the entry of this Order. The initial case management conference on August 16, 2013 as to this case is CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/26/13. Associated Member Case: 3:13-0510.(dt)
May 21, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond is GRANTED, and Defendant shall have through Monday, June 24, 2013, to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/21/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Ramdev Ji, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramdev Ji, LLC
Represented By: Celia Marie Stacey
Represented By: Jimmy H. Watson, Sr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Hall
Represented By: Richard D. Piliponis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]