Bondwe v. Mapco Inc

Plaintiff: Richard Bondwe
Defendant: Mapco Inc
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00419
Filed: May 2, 2013
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Mapco Express's Motion to Dismiss (Docket No. 8 ) is GRANTED. The Amended Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiff shall be granted leave to file an Amended Complaint before November 27, 2013. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/15/2013. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)
April 7, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference is reset for 4/14/2014 at 3:15 PM before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/7/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
April 15, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Motion to Amend Pleadings due by 8/1/2014. Discovery due by 12/15/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 2/28/2015. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/15/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
April 15, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL: Jury Trial set for 8/4/2015 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Pretrial Conference set for 7/31/2015 at 1:30 PM before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Exhibit List and Witness List due by 7/28/2015. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/28/2015. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/15/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bondwe v. Mapco Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Bondwe
Represented By: Allen Woods
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mapco Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]