Summers v. First State Bank

Defendant: First State Bank
Plaintiff: Ashley Summers
Case Number: 3:2013cv00439
Filed: May 9, 2013
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Sumner
Presiding Judge: Todd J. Campbell
Referring Judge: Juliet E. Griffin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12131 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 17, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference and Extend Deadline for Submission of Proposed Case Management Order 10 is Granted. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 8/9/2013 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Juli et E. Griffin. Stay of Discovery is Lifted. Counsel shall e-file the proposed initial case management order by 8/6/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 6/17/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
August 12, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #1: Discovery due by 3/10/2014, and dispositive motions due by 4/10/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 8/12/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(la)
August 12, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #2: Amended Pleadings due by 9/3/2013. Discovery due by 3/10/2014 and Dispositive Motions due by 4/10/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 8/12/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(la)
August 12, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Jury Trial set for 9/16/2014 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Pretrial Conference set for 9/8/2014 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 874 before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 8/12/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(la)
October 28, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 10/28/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
May 9, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management. Discovery is not stayed absent order of the District Judge. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Judge. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 5/9/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
March 28, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Pending before the Court are Defendant First State Bank's Motions For Leave To File Reply Memorandum Of Law (Docket Nos. 52 , 53 ). The Motions are GRANTED. Accordingly, the Clerk is directed to file the attachments to Docket Nos. 52 and 53 . Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 3/28/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
August 21, 2014 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The 82 Joint Motion to Continue Trial is GRANTED. The jury trial set for September 16, 2014, is CONTINUED until February 10, 2015, at 9:00 a.m. The pretrial conference set for September 8, 2014, is CONTINUED until January 30, 2015, at 2:30 p.m. Exhibit List, Witness List, and Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/23/2015. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 8/21/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)
August 25, 2014 84 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 58 Motion for Summary Judgment and 77 Motion to Strike. The Magistrate Judge recommends that Defendant's motion (Docket Entry No. 77) to strike be denied, and the Defendants' motion (Docket Entry No. 58) for summary judgment be granted and the action be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 8/25/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)
August 25, 2014 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 41 and 43 Motions to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 8/25/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Summers v. First State Bank
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First State Bank
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Summers
Represented By: Clinton H. Scott
Represented By: Gary F. Lynch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]