Brown v. Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust et al

Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. and Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust
Plaintiff: Richard Brown
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00479
Filed: May 17, 2013
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Juliet E. Griffin
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 12, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 6/26/2013 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin. The stay of discovery is Lifted.Counsel shall e-file the proposed order prior to the initial case management conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 6/12/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
August 26, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED ORDER : It appears to the Court, as evidenced by the signature of counsel of the parties below, that this matter as it relates to defendant Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust only, shall be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)( 2). It further appears to the court that Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., is the proper defendant in this action since Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., owned and operated the subject store at the time of plaintiff's accident on September 16, 2012. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 8/26/13. (la)
May 19, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 5/19/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
June 6, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 Motion for Entry of Agreed Order. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/6/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
June 6, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED ORDER: The law firm of HOWELL & FISHER, PLLC, or its designated representatives shall be allowed by written request only to inspect and/or obtain certified copies of all employment records, income tax returns, medical records, medical report s, medical charts, mental health records, psychiatric records, psychology records, x-ray films, tissue slides or other laboratory specimens, diagnostic studies, pharmacy/prescription records, itemized billing records with payments-made information, insurance records, other documents or writings, including but not limited to protected health information as that term is defined in 45 C.F.R. Part 160 and Part 164 (HIPAA Privacy Rule) (collectively, the "Medical Information"), related to the care and treatment of RICHARD BROWN. This includes medical records as they pertain to drug and alcohol and HIV/AIDS treatment. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/6/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Brown v. Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Represented By: George Andrew Rowlett
Represented By: Susan Scott VanDyke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust
Represented By: Susan Scott VanDyke
Represented By: George Andrew Rowlett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Brown
Represented By: Michael K. Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]