Marcus v. The Farm at Natchez Trace, Inc.

Defendant: The Farm at Natchez Trace, Inc.
Plaintiff: Karen Marcus
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00498
Filed: May 23, 2013
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Williamson
Referring Judge: Joe Brown
Presiding Judge: Todd J. Campbell
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 27, 2014 17 Featured Case ORDER: Telephone conference held on 1/27/14. Counsel for the Plaintiff called in at the appointed time set in Docket Entry 15. Unfortunately, counsel forthe Defendant did not call in. Counsel for the Defendant should file with the Court a brief explanation for the miscue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 1/27/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
June 6, 2014 20 Featured Case ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 6/11/2014 at 11:00 AM to discuss the setting of a date for the settlement conference. To participate in the conference call, the parties are required to call (615) 695-2851 at the scheduled time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 6/6/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
June 12, 2014 21 Featured Case ORDER: Dispositive Motions deadline reset to 9/8/2014. Settlement Conference set for 7/28/2014 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. By 12:00 NOON on Wednesday, 7/23/2014, Plaintiff and Defendant shall email to the undersigned at brownchamb ers@tnmd.uscourts.gov, ex parte, separate settlement conference statements which shall specify their respective settlement positions. Parties shall exchange offers and demands at least three working days prior to the 7/28/2014, conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 6/12/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
July 28, 2014 23 Featured Case ORDER: The parties have reached settlement terms in this matter. Accordingly, the parties are requested to submit an order of dismissal to Judge Campbell to dismiss this case with prejudice. The necessary paperwork should be submitted within 30 days of the entry of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 7/28/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)
August 8, 2013 9 Featured Case ORDER granting 8 MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 8/8/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Marcus v. The Farm at Natchez Trace, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Farm at Natchez Trace, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Marcus
Represented By: Clinton H. Scott
Represented By: Michael L. Russell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]