Sevier v. Apple Inc. Featured Case

Defendant: Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: Chris Sevier
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00607
Filed: June 19, 2013
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Todd J. Campbell
 
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2014 143 NOTICE of Filing by Chris Sevier re 142 MOTION to Dismiss or for an Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Original Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Motion to reopen 3:13-cv-01099, # 2 Exhibit summons was submitted to the clerk's office to reissue in regards to the original complaint)(Sevier, Chris)
September 23, 2014 142 MOTION to Dismiss or for an Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Original Complaint by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Summons to Apple)(Ford, Sara)
September 23, 2014 141 RESPONSE in Opposition re 137 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint filed by Apple Inc.. (Ford, Sara)
September 19, 2014 140 Featured Case ORDER: Pending before the Court is a Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge 131 , to which no Objections have been filed. The Court has reviewed the Report and Recommendation and the file. The result of the Report and Recommendation is adopted and approved, but the reasoning is not. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint 60 is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 9/19/14. (xc:Pro se party by electronic notification.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) Modified Text on 9/19/2014 (dt).
September 9, 2014 139 First MOTION to Strike 34 Memorandum in Support by Chris Sevier. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit An email I sent to Apple's counsel in seeking permission to amend the complaint, which recieved no response.)(Sevier, Chris)
September 9, 2014 138 MEMORANDUM in Support of 64 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,, 137 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint , 86 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Chris Sevier . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Article about Jennifer Lawrence hacking., # 2 Exhibit An article about Christian men struggling with easily accessible pornography, # 3 Exhibit Another article on the Jennifer Lawrence leak., # 4 Exhibit An article on Ashton Kutcher's organization that is fighting child porn "Thorn.", # 5 Exhibit New campaign in the UK targets human trafficking, # 6 Exhibit This is an article about the human trafficking problem in Birmingham Alabama where Apple's lawyers reside.)(Sevier, Chris)
September 9, 2014 137 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint by Chris Sevier. (Sevier, Chris)
September 8, 2014 136 RESPONSE in Opposition re 127 First MOTION to Bifurcate filed by Apple Inc., Hewlett Packard. (Ford, Sara)
September 5, 2014 135 Featured Case ORDER: This matter is before the Court upon the pro se Plaintiff's "Motion Under Rule 33, 26(b), and LR 11.3 to Allow the Plaintiff to Serve Additional Interrogatories Given Apple and Hewlett Packards Violations of Criminal and Civil Law." Docket No. 56. Plaintiff has filed a supporting Memorandum. Docket No. 57. Defendants have filed a Response in Opposition to the Motion. Docket No. 68. Following the filing of the instant Motion, the Court granted Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery. Docket Nos. 73, 79. Because discovery in this case has been stayed, the instant Motion (Docket No. 56 ) is DENIED AS MOOT, without prejudice to being refiled if and as may be appropriate. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 9/5/2014. (xc: Pro se party by electronic notification) (eh)
September 5, 2014 134 Featured Case ORDER denying 49 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 9/5/2014. (xc:Pro se party by electronic notification.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)
September 5, 2014 133 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 44 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 9/5/2014. (xc:Pro se party by electronic notification.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)
September 5, 2014 132 Featured Case ORDER denying 33 Motion to Disqualify Counsel.. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 9/5/2014. (xc:Pro se party by electronic notification)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)
September 2, 2014 131 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The instant Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint (Docket No. 60) should be DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 9/2/2014. (xc:Pro se party by electronic notification.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)
August 26, 2014 130 NOTICE by Chris Sevier re 118 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction against ONLY Eric Holder, Mike O'Reilly, Edith Ramirez, 119 Memorandum in Support, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Foreseeable severance and joined of state and federal executive attorney general officials in a single action where I will be asking the Court to impose an injunction to make them enforce obscenity laws agaisnt device makers of cell phones and lap tops)(Sevier, Chris)
August 26, 2014 129 NOTICE of Filing by Chris Sevier re 93 MOTION to Supplement 91 Reply to Response to Motion, 90 Response in Opposition to Motion, 86 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , 87 Memorandum in Support,,,, , 71 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, 86 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Declaration filed in Google, # 2 Exhibit A web page from youtube showing that the Anti-Human trafficking video was taken down by the Defendants after google lawsuit was filed., # 3 Exhibit webpage that shows that the mercy video was taken down by the Defendants after the filing of the google lawsuit., # 4 Exhibit A print out of a webpage from youtube where a youtube anti-human trafficking/anti-porn video was taken down by google after the filing of this lawsuit, # 5 Exhibit a website from youtube that with indications that the zedd vocal edit was removed by google after the filing of the apple lawsuit, alleging that the content was removed for being pornographic., # 6 Exhibit email between Tajuan McCarty and myself regarding the video and song that was made for her and then removed by the Defendants,, # 7 Exhibit message between Grace is messy and myself about the anti-trafficking song/video made in support of the Well House that the Defendants removed., # 8 Exhibit A page from the Well House's website regarding their mission, # 9 Exhibit A page from the Well House's website regarding their needs., # 10 Exhibit A page from the Well House's website regarding rescues, # 11 Exhibit A page from the Well House's website regarding their fight against prostitution, # 12 Exhibit A message from Bridge of Hope about how they were using the Mercy video at one of their conventions to support their cause, only for the Defendants to remove it., # 13 Exhibit email between sparrow hope for girls and myself regarding the video that the Defendants censored in response to this lawsuit, # 14 Exhibit message from Mother's against trafficking regarding the anti-trafficking video that the Defendants censored, # 15 Exhibit Google removed my anti-trafficking video and and blostered the one referenced in this webpage instead., # 16 Exhibit comments from the apple pro-porn distribution video that Google backed., # 17 Exhibit A message from the Serenity Ranch regarding the video that the Defendants censored)(Sevier, Chris)
August 25, 2014 128 MEMORANDUM in Support of 127 First MOTION to Bifurcate filed by Chris Sevier . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit blog entry from FTND, # 2 Exhibit An esteemed study identifies sexual addiction, # 3 Exhibit An article on the porn effect, # 4 Exhibit An article entitled "What if it was your daughter in that porn scene?", # 5 Exhibit This is an article by a former pornographer., # 6 Exhibit Article by a former pornographer who has turned on Apple and HP, # 7 Exhibit An article from a former pornographer who discusses a terrible topic about a fiance finding pictures of one of his former victims., # 8 Exhibit This is an article about a man facing 15 years in prison for porn related matters in connection with filterless devices., # 9 Exhibit An article about the porn that Apple and HP type companies distribute and how it relates to the demand side of human trafficking., # 10 Exhibit An article about a mom calling 911 after her 15 year old son watches porn., # 11 Exhibit Here is an article that Apple and HP can use in one of their advertisment campaigns about a girl who was raped and video taped and the video is being distributed on filterless devices., # 12 Exhibit Here is an article called, " Porn is an affair, just ask my-ex wife.", # 13 Exhibit Here is an article posted by Pink Cross called "Your ditry little secret and their real life nightmare.", # 14 Exhibit An article about how pornography is now part of everyday life, thanks to the "no censorship policy" by device makers like Apple and HP, # 15 Exhibit An article about porn and the lower brain functionality., # 16 Exhibit This is an article about Google fighting porn; but Apple and HP are not included in the article.)(Sevier, Chris)
August 25, 2014 127 First MOTION to Bifurcate by Chris Sevier. (Sevier, Chris)
August 25, 2014 126 MOTION for Leave to leave for the Court to accept my reply brief in response to the motion for a preliminary injunction re 93 MOTION to Supplement 91 Reply to Response to Motion, 90 Response in Opposition to Motion, 86 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , 87 Memorandum in Support,,,, , 91 Reply to Response to Motion, 92 Declaration,,,,,,,,,,,,,, 90 Response in Opposition to Motion, 87 Memorandum in Support,,,, by Chris Sevier. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit An article from the UK about a 15 year old boy watching porn and acting out what he saw on a 10 year old girl. The Judge in the article wants a filtering system in place., # 2 Exhibit an article about a memphis attorney being sentenced to jail for porn access on filterless devices, # 3 Exhibit Tennessee celebrates anti-porn week, # 4 Exhibit article about filters in place on school computers, but not on personal laptops and cell phones., # 5 Exhibit An article about how it's illegal to make porn in TN, # 6 Exhibit article about Lamar Alexander's aid killing himself after he apparently accessed child porn on a filterless device., # 7 Exhibit an article about a child porn case in TN, # 8 Exhibit A page from a porn rehab center in TN, # 9 Exhibit An articel about porn's ties to human trafficking, # 10 Exhibit An article from Tennessee about sexual predators, # 11 Exhibit An article about Sex Week at UT, # 12 Exhibit A web posting about the DOJ and US attorney's office prosecution, # 13 Exhibit An article about a Wilson County man and child porn, # 14 Exhibit An article about the complaints of UT sex week., # 15 Exhibit An article about a TN homeless man charged with child porn count., # 16 Exhibit FBI child porn case in TN against a woman., # 17 Exhibit an article about a TN pastor implicated in child porn case., # 18 Exhibit webpage of TN group fighting human trafficking in response to filterless devices., # 19 Exhibit webpage of TN group fighting human trafficking in response to filterless devices., # 20 Exhibit webpage of TN group fighting human trafficking in response to filterless devices., # 21 Exhibit webpage of TN group fighting human trafficking in response to filterless devices., # 22 Exhibit webpage of TN group fighting human trafficking in response to filterless devices., # 23 Exhibit webpage of TN group fighting human trafficking in response to filterless devices., # 24 Exhibit webpage of TN group fighting human trafficking in response to filterless devices., # 25 Exhibit webpage of TN group fighting human trafficking in response to filterless devices., # 26 Exhibit A report from the Pentagon about how porn is a problem in the military and a solution is needed.)(Sevier, Chris)
August 19, 2014 125 NOTICE of Filing by Chris Sevier re 71 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, 64 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,, 119 Memorandum in Support, 107 Memorandum in Support,, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit response in opposition to motion to dismiss filed by Governor Haslam and Attorney General Cooper, # 2 Exhibit Motion to dismiss adoption and termination case for admitting porn addiction., # 3 Exhibit Declarations put together in at in person interviews with Jason McKenzie)(Sevier, Chris)
August 11, 2014 124 NOTICE of Filing by Chris Sevier re 64 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,, 60 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , 120 Response in Opposition to Motion, 63 Notice (Other), 106 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases Apple with Google. The Parties in the Google action have been served. Consolidation will preserve judiciary economy., 87 Memorandum in Support,,,, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amended response to motion to dismiss filed by Verizon, # 2 Exhibit Response in opposition to Dell's motion to dismiss, # 3 Exhibit Article about Dell being good for porn, # 4 Exhibit Seagate CEO brags about their companies aid in helping advance Apple and Dell's porn racket, # 5 Exhibit Dell pays 100 million to the SEC for fraud. This fraud is nothing compared the fraud committed here. Dell cooked books there. Here, they cook brains and marriages., # 6 Exhibit Dell names a blog on their website after a porn site. See Porn Compact with Apple, # 7 Exhibit While Dell is providing direct links to porn sites from its website, Apple is not far behind. See Porn compact, # 8 Exhibit Dell employees swiping porn from laptops., # 9 Exhibit We need more than petitions, we need Court action., # 10 Exhibit Verizon and porn petitions and porn compact with Apple, # 11 Exhibit Professor Ford thinks that it was my idea that Sex Trafficking demand is tied to Apple's porn distribtuion network. Thanks but see the Washington Times., # 12 Exhibit Fox News covering down on Verizon's decision to distribute incest and child themed porn. See porn compact with Apple and HP., # 13 Exhibit Verizon sells Apple products; Verizon engages in scams; and one plus one equals two., # 14 Exhibit Professor Ford thinks that it was my idea to equate computer porn to a playboy. Not so much., # 15 Exhibit Brian on porn is like a brain on cocaine., # 16 Exhibit Rich's civil case nonsuited, which was a platform for phony stalking charges. In the same way Apple and HP set a platform for predatory pornographers to assault users., # 17 Exhibit equating nicotine and porn and their similar mark on the brian. See negligent failure to warn arguments., # 18 Exhibit Its groups like Fight The New Drug who are going to take down Apple in the end if they do not comply with the request here. Also, Arizon Family Counsel, Family Research Counsel, America liberty counsel, and others are going to gear up and pursue Apple in representing victims of sex trafficking who were harmed by jons who got their start down voyeurims after accessing porn on their HP and Apple products. Its best to clean their hands of these matters which will likely ward off the litigation that will come. There can only be so many failed petitions until these groups have had enough.)(Sevier, Chris)
August 6, 2014 123 NOTICE of Filing by Chris Sevier re 61 Memorandum in Support, 64 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,, 60 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , 97 Reply to Response to Motion,, 107 Memorandum in Support,, 68 Response in Opposition to Motion, 94 First MOTION , 93 MOTION to Supplement 91 Reply to Response to Motion, 90 Response in Opposition to Motion, 86 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , 87 Memorandum in Support,,,, , 71 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, 86 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , 106 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases Apple with Google. The Parties in the Google action have been served. Consolidation will preserve judiciary economy., 87 Memorandum in Support,,,, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit response in opposition to Verizon's motion to dismiss, which includes applicable legal authority that applies directly here, # 2 Exhibit Table of contents, # 3 Exhibit Rich withdrew his phony malicious prosecution lawsuit which was the platform for the fake stalking charges. I am filing this so that in the record so that Rich's harassments can be minimized in order to protect the proceedings here)(Sevier, Chris)
August 6, 2014 122 MOTION to Withdraw Document 121 Order on Motion for Default Judgment, Order on Motion to Clarify,,,, 120 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Chris Sevier. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit The Court should accept second amended complaint and not dismiss it for the same reasons that the Court should accep the complaint in Google. These actions should be consolidated., # 2 Exhibit header for response in opposition to motion to dismiss in Google in response to Verizon.)(Sevier, Chris)
August 5, 2014 121 DENIAL OF DEFAULT: Pending is Plaintiff's Second Motion for Default Judgment against Defendants Apple, Inc., and Hewlett Packard Company (Docket Entry No. 110 ). The motion is denied for the reasons stated in Defendants' Response (Docket Entry No. 120). The docket clerk is instructed to terminate the motion as pending on the docket. To the extent Plaintiff's motion constitutes more than a motion for default judgment; Plaintiff should file a new motion for the Court's determination leaving out the request for default judgment. Signed by Keith Throckmorton, Clerk of Court on 8/5/2014. (xc:Pro se party by electronic notification.)(eh)
August 1, 2014 120 RESPONSE in Opposition re 110 Second MOTION for Default Judgment as to MOTION to Clarify re 70 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages , 64 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,, filed by Apple Inc., Hewlett Packard. (Ford, Sara)
July 31, 2014 119 MEMORANDUM in Support of 118 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction against ONLY Eric Holder, Mike O'Reilly, Edith Ramirez filed by Chris Sevier WELCOME back Apple and HP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Eric Holder is number one on the Dirty Dozen List)(Sevier, Chris)
July 31, 2014 118 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction against ONLY Eric Holder, Mike O'Reilly, Edith Ramirez by Chris Sevier. (Sevier, Chris)
July 31, 2014 117 RESPONSE in Opposition re 116 MOTION to Withdraw Document filed by Chris Sevier. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit email evidence showing that Dr. Reisman was well informed of these matters. A group from D.C. got to her after I filed her Declaration, # 2 Exhibit email evidence showing that Dr. Reisman was well informed of these matters. A group from D.C. got to her after I filed her Declaration, # 3 Exhibit email evidence showing that Dr. Reisman was well informed of these matters. A group from D.C. got to her after I filed her Declaration, # 4 Exhibit email evidence showing that Dr. Reisman was well informed of these matters. A group from D.C. got to her after I filed her Declaration, # 5 Exhibit email evidence showing that Dr. Reisman was well informed of these matters. A group from D.C. got to her after I filed her Declaration, # 6 Exhibit email evidence showing that Dr. Reisman was well informed of these matters. A group from D.C. got to her after I filed her Declaration, # 7 Exhibit email evidence showing that Dr. Reisman was well informed of these matters. A group from D.C. got to her after I filed her Declaration, # 8 Exhibit email evidence showing that Dr. Reisman was well informed of these matters. A group from D.C. got to her after I filed her Declaration, # 9 Exhibit email evidence showing that Dr. Reisman was well informed of these matters. A group from D.C. got to her after I filed her Declaration)(Sevier, Chris)
July 30, 2014 116 Withdrawal of Declaration, by Judith G. Reisman. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Letter)(afs) Modified on 7/31/2014 (afs).
July 30, 2014 115 RESPONSE in Opposition re 106 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases Apple with Google. The Parties in the Google action have been served. Consolidation will preserve judiciary economy. filed by Apple Inc., Hewlett Packard. (Ford, Sara)
July 23, 2014 114 NOTICE of Filing by Chris Sevier re 86 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , 87 Memorandum in Support,,,, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit medical report by Dr. Weiss on brain science of pornography. The scientific evidence supporting my claims is overwelming on my side., # 2 Exhibit refiling the Witherspoon Report to make sure that it attaches to the motion for an injunction to support my position of porn's harm and the fact that it is a pulbic health crisis. If the Court sides with the Plaintiff, it will ratify the diligent efforts of the Witherspoon Institute.)(Sevier, Chris)
July 18, 2014 113 DECLARATION of Dr. Judith Reisman filed by Chris Sevier re: 112 Notice (Other), 86 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , 87 Memorandum in Support,,,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Dr. Reisman will attest at trial to the damaging impact of porn on the brain and to the harm to society. Here is some of her research on porns impact on children which supports my demand for relief, # 2 Exhibit Executive summary of porns impact on children and adults, # 3 Exhibit Data that Dr. Reisman will use to support my position, # 4 Exhibit Dr. Reisman's assembled time line of permission giving ideas that have lead us to here)(Sevier, Chris)
July 18, 2014 112 NOTICE of Filing by Chris Sevier re 86 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Dr. Reisman's declarations (Sevier, Chris)
July 18, 2014 111 MEMORANDUM in Support of 110 Second MOTION for Default Judgment as to MOTION to Clarify re 70 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages , 64 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,, filed by Chris Sevier . (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Let this serve as a bad example as to why Congress needs a catalyst.)(Sevier, Chris)
July 18, 2014 110 Second MOTION for Default Judgment as to , MOTION to Clarify re 70 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages , 64 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,, by Chris Sevier. (Sevier, Chris)
July 17, 2014 109 NOTICE of Filing by Chris Sevier re 106 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases Apple with Google. The Parties in the Google action have been served. Consolidation will preserve judiciary economy., 107 Memorandum in Support,, (Attachments: # 1 Attachment motion to consolidate Google with Apple, # 2 Attachment Memorandum in support to consolidate Google and Appel)(Sevier, Chris)
July 16, 2014 108 NOTICE of Filing by Chris Sevier re 86 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , 87 Memorandum in Support,,,, 20 Governors and 20 Attorney General's sued in Federal Court in New York (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 20 Governors and Attorney General's sued and pressure imposed on them to help offset presure imposed on the Court to give me the relief requested here. This is merely a seconardy effect of that litigaiton and by no means is an ulterior motive to accomplish unjustifable ends. I will leave the game playing pursuant to nefarious depraved heart syndrome to scoundrels who make the decisions at Apple, # 2 Exhibit a couples of emails that prove that same-sex plaintiff's plight is not about equality. Like Apple they are playing ends justify the means games in the area of sex for their own selfish benefit, and in the process destroying the integrity of the law.)(Sevier, Chris)
July 16, 2014 107 MEMORANDUM in Support of 106 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases Apple with Google. The Parties in the Google action have been served. Consolidation will preserve judiciary economy. filed by Chris Sevier . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit google is moving against porn, # 2 Exhibit crack in the damn to porn compact, # 3 Exhibit this organizaiton's efforts should be rewarded by the Court, # 4 Exhibit consolidation exhibit, # 5 Exhibit more on google's move against porn. The Court and I need to help Google in their efforts)(Sevier, Chris)
July 16, 2014 106 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases Apple with Google. The Parties in the Google action have been served. Consolidation will preserve judiciary economy. by Chris Sevier. (Sevier, Chris)
June 20, 2014 105 NOTICE of Filing by Chris Sevier re 86 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , 87 Memorandum in Support,,,, I'll let Apple look up the exhibits filed with this complaint in the other case (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Complaint against Google, Samsung, LG, xBox, ect all part of the porn compact with Apple and HP)(Sevier, Chris)
June 13, 2014 104 DECLARATION of Chris Sevier - intervention in these cases was executed to protect the rule of law - which has a connection to this litigation filed by Chris Sevier re: 86 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , 87 Memorandum in Support,,,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Motiont to intervene in the same sex marriage in the 5th Circuit Court of Appeals, # 2 Exhibit Body of the motion to interevene in the 5th Circuit Court of Appeals - evidence of the harm of being exposed to pornography, # 3 Exhibit Motion to intervene in the 10th Circuit Court of Appeals - proof of the harm of pornography, # 4 Exhibit body of motion before the 10th Circuit to intervene for reasons that directly relate to this action. Unlike the same sex married couples, I do not want to recruit children to have their sexual orientation altered, # 5 Exhibit Body of the motion for reconsideration before the 10th Circuit, # 6 Exhibit Heading to the motion to intervene in Tanco before the 6th Circuit Court of Appeals, # 7 Exhibit body of the motion to interevene in the 6th Circuit in Tanco. If the Court will recall, I attempted to have this case consolidated with that action., # 8 Exhibit Body of the motion to intervene in the 4th Circuit. I am a proponent of the rule law. I do not appreciate seeing obscenity laws not enforced, and I do not want to allow hypocrisy to undermine the 14th Amendment of the United States Constitution, # 9 Exhibit Motion to intervene in Arizona, # 10 Exhibit Motion to intervene in South Carolina)(Sevier, Chris)
June 12, 2014 103 DECLARATION of Clay Olsen - Founder of Fight The New Drug filed by Chris Sevier re: 86 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , 97 Reply to Response to Motion,, 87 Memorandum in Support,,,, 94 First MOTION . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit This is the smoking gun to the case. Mr. Olsen qualifies as an expert as to the public health crisis component. Here are hundreds of testimonials from the youth who are have been victimized by Apple and HP's defective design and flagrant disregard of obscenity laws. For their sake the Court must impose the injunction as I have requested.)(Sevier, Chris)
June 9, 2014 102 DECLARATION of Precious Carolyn - a resident of Nashville whose marriage was destroyed due to easily accessible pornography on the defendants unsafe products filed by Chris Sevier re: 86 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , 97 Reply to Response to Motion,, 87 Memorandum in Support,,,,. (Sevier, Chris)
June 7, 2014 101 DECLARATION of FBI Infragard Tiffany Leeper filed by Chris Sevier re: 86 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FBI Infragrad Tiffany Leeper is from Nashville. She is a victim of porn, and has committed her life to fighting it. Here is one of her papers linking pornography to sex trafficking. She may qualify as an expert on some issues. If the Court rules in my favor in the Preliminary injunction, I ask that it deflect credit onto sweet Tiffany, who works nearly round the clock on combating pornography., # 2 Exhibit Sweet Tiffany, started an organization called Girls Against Porn. Here is picture of her projecting bombing the DOJ (in a peaceful way). But she takes porn as a life and death matter., # 3 Exhibit Porn is killing people. Its killing our society. It is violating the the natural design. We as leaders must not replace truth with lies. Freedom is birthed from truth. Freedom is not the abscene of restriction or the presence of restriction. Freedom is the imposition of the right restrictions. The restrictions I have set forth in the Preliminary injuction are the right ones.)(Sevier, Chris)
May 28, 2014 100 DECLARATION of Former Porn Star Activist Jan Villarubia: God chose the weak things of the world to shame the strong. 1 Corinthians 1:27 filed by Chris Sevier re: 64 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,, 97 Reply to Response to Motion,, 87 Memorandum in Support,,,,. (Sevier, Chris)
May 28, 2014 99 DECLARATION of Shelley Lubben Former Porn Star and CEO of Pink Cross Foundation filed by Chris Sevier re: 91 Reply to Response to Motion, 86 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , 64 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,, 97 Reply to Response to Motion,,. (Sevier, Chris)
May 27, 2014 98 DECLARATION of Chris Sevier filed by Chris Sevier re: 97 Reply to Response to Motion,, 96 Response in Opposition to Motion, 91 Reply to Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit certificate of service, # 2 Exhibit There are teenages who are killiing themselves over this; the Court must act in the best interest of children, # 3 Exhibit Former Porn Star turned Director of The Pink Cross Foundation is providing her declaration tonight, # 4 Exhibit From Nashville, Tiffany Leeper has been asked to provide her declaration; she links porn to sex trafficking., # 5 Exhibit Donna Rice Hughes has been asked to provide her declarations: demonstrating that pornography is a public health crisis and damning evidence about Apple and HP's link to pornographers, # 6 Exhibit Matt Fradd Author of Delivered has been asked to provide his declarations, which he is a victim of pornography that he accessed on a filterless computer, # 7 Exhibit Coalition Against Sex Trafficking is the conference I went to in order to recruit experts and victms to boldly step out of the shadows; the converference was held by Morality in Media, # 8 Exhibit Pure Hope; I love these guys. They have even Parterned up with Tim Keller; this group has such a huge heart for victims of pornographers - both men and women - that I asked them to attest.)(Sevier, Chris)
May 23, 2014 97 REPLY to Response to Motion re 86 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , 93 MOTION to Supplement 91 Reply to Response to Motion, 90 Response in Opposition to Motion, 86 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , 87 Memorandum in Support,,,, filed by Chris Sevier. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Fight The New Drug, # 2 Exhibit Enough Is Enough, # 3 Exhibit Recap of Coalition against Sex Trafficking, # 4 Exhibit Porn Harms organization, # 5 Exhibit Pink Cross Foundation)(Sevier, Chris)
May 20, 2014 96 RESPONSE in Opposition re 94 First MOTION for Oral Argument filed by Apple Inc., Hewlett Packard. (Ford, Sara)
May 9, 2014 95 DECLARATION of Chris Sevier regarding recording interviews with employees at Apple and HP filed by Chris Sevier re: 91 Reply to Response to Motion, 92 Declaration,,,,,,,,,,,,,, 90 Response in Opposition to Motion, 86 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , 87 Memorandum in Support,,,, 93 MOTION to Supplement 91 Reply to Response to Motion, 90 Response in Opposition to Motion, 86 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , 87 Memorandum in Support,,,, . (Sevier, Chris)
May 6, 2014 94 First MOTION by Chris Sevier. (Sevier, Chris)
May 6, 2014 93 MOTION to Supplement 91 Reply to Response to Motion, 90 Response in Opposition to Motion, 86 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , 87 Memorandum in Support,,,, by Chris Sevier. (Sevier, Chris)
May 5, 2014 92 DECLARATION of Chris Sevier filed by Chris Sevier re: 91 Reply to Response to Motion, 90 Response in Opposition to Motion, 86 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , 87 Memorandum in Support,,,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Email exchange between Dr. Reisman and myself. She will be providing declarations to support the motion for Preliminary injunction. She will be one of many experts testifying at trial, # 2 Exhibit Here is one of the reports Dr. Reisman provided me that she will using to testify from. Dr. Reisman proves that porn is damaging, which makes the defendants products dangers and defective in their current condition, # 3 Exhibit Here is another report that Dr. Reisman provided me that she will attesting to at a trial on the merits. The Court can see that I will be able to establish that the porn that Apple and HP expose myself to is harmful, making their products dangerous., # 4 Exhibit Here is another report that Dr. Reisman provided me specifically to support this motion for a preliminary injunction. The Court should give the relief I want, and folks with alot more clout than I will pounce on the Senate and House to make all device makers comply with obscenity laws. The attack and reprisal that Dr. Reisman has sustained as a result of fighting against pornography and other evils of our world are miraculous. I ask that the Court grant this outstanding citizen an opportunity to be heard and to heal from the horror that she has been put through in fighting smut., # 5 Exhibit Part of the Solution: the apple Genius team walked me through how my propose solution is a low burden breaze with HUGE reward. The first step is to click on the Apple icon and select system preferences., # 6 Exhibit Next step deal with parental controls. Although there are no passwords required. This can change. Its as if Apple provided these functions to give the surface level appearance that they were complying with obscenity laws. Apple has a feature called Parental controls, but turns around sells their products to non-parents = Apple hypocrisy., # 7 Exhibit Under Parental controls, one can select "web." Then there is an icon that is not selected upon purchase which concerns blocking "adult websites." Apple knowledges that "adult websites" are dangerous by including this feature, but they do not do enough to protect us because they want us looking at porn and dependent on their device. This is why they are fighting me so hard in this lawsuit., # 8 Exhibit Despite Professor Ford's litany of dishonest statements, Apple has conveniently made it so that they can customize parental controls to block sites that full adult content and illegally being distributed to every purchaser - espeically children. Apple can be required to "block all adult websites" to include backpages.com - forcing these sites ditch their escort section. This will have a MASSIVE impact on law enforcement and child victimization., # 9 Exhibit Here is evidence that Apple machine never leaves their control. In fact the products stay in contact with the "mothership." Also, incuded in these software updates and be modifications to parental controls, making Apple uniquely best positioned to constantly improve the quality control of their filtering devices. All of these things I am stating paint a crystal clear picture that the Court should give me the relief I seek for the sake of myself and humanity., # 10 Exhibit Proof that Apple products do not leave their control. When Safari crashes, it sends a report to Apple Tech support because the machine is connected to Apple.)(Sevier, Chris)
May 5, 2014 91 REPLY to Response to Motion re 86 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Chris Sevier. (Sevier, Chris)
April 24, 2014 90 RESPONSE in Opposition re 86 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Apple Inc., Hewlett Packard. (Ford, Sara)
April 17, 2014 89 AFFIDAVIT re 88 Notice (Other), 86 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , 87 Memorandum in Support,,,, by Chris Sevier. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Dr. Hitlon on youtube attesting in a manner that supports this action as he will at trial, # 2 Exhibit Dr. Hilton's credentials for the Court to see so that it can feel assurd that he qualifies as an expert under rule 702, # 3 Exhibit Mary Anne Layden articel for the Court to see that she is an expert, who will confirm the allegations in the complaint and injunction, # 4 Exhibit Another Dr. Layden article, # 5 Exhibit Another Dr. Layden article, # 6 Exhibit Another Dr. Layden article, # 7 Exhibit Another Dr. Layden article: If pornography made us healthy, we would be healthy by now, # 8 Exhibit This is one of the studies that Gary Wilson, at yourbrainonporn.com, referenced in his email to me., # 9 Exhibit Here is another article that Gary Wilson provided, which convincing argues that Apple and HP products are sold in a manner that expose us to unwanted addiction, # 10 Exhibit Here is a website that Gary Wilson referenced, where kids are tryinig desperately to hold one another accountable and not give into masturbating to the porn that Apple and HP have mercilessly exposed them to., # 11 Exhibit Here is another article that Gary Wilson referenced in our discussions that he would analyse before the Court when called to testify as an expert, # 12 Exhibit Dr. Hilton will attest to this compelling document, # 13 Exhibit Another document by Dr. Hilton that he will attest to at trial, # 14 Exhibit Another document by Dr. Hilton that should alone carry the day in granting the motion for a preliminary injunction, # 15 Exhibit Emails between Gary Wilson and I to show that these experts will testify and that the Court should factor in their expected testimony in ruling on the motion for a preliminary injunction, # 16 Exhibit Here are documents that Dr. Layden sent to me directly. They will be used by her at trial. The Court should grant the motion for a preliminary injunction on the basis of her inevitable testimony, # 17 Exhibit Here is another document Dr. Layden complied and sent to me for this case. The Court should consider these reliable findings., # 18 Exhibit Here is an email proof that Dr. Layden and I are in communication about her testifying in these matters.)(Sevier, Chris)
April 17, 2014 88 NOTICE of Filing by Chris Sevier re 86 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Sevier, Chris)
April 10, 2014 87 MEMORANDUM in Support of 86 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Chris Sevier . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Senator Corker's email to me from this morning. After a follow up, there is a door that has been blown wide open. I need the Court to grant this motion and the Senate will pounce on having all device makers sell their products on safe mode. I'm asking the Court to play an essential role in a fight against modern day slavery. Make no mistake about that. The matter is a political hot potato, so by granting this motion the Court will creat the perfect catalyst. Please grant the motion, # 2 Exhibit There are hundreds of articles out there that are relevant. But this one article on this topic stood out. The Court should review it. It regards the impact of porn on a teenager. We must stop this kind of thing from happening., # 3 Exhibit Here is website that I think is particularly persuasive, regarding the science that backs my position. I recommend that the Court check it out.)(Sevier, Chris)
April 10, 2014 86 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Chris Sevier. (Sevier, Chris)
February 26, 2014 85 Featured Case ORDER denying 83 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 2/26/14. (xc:Pro se party by email notification)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)
February 25, 2014 84 MEMORANDUM in Support of 83 First MOTION for Reconsideration re 79 Order on Motion to Stay, 74 Memorandum in Support , 73 MOTION to Stay Discovery, 79 Order on Motion to Stay, 74 Memorandum in Support filed by Chris Sevier . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit This is entirely unacceptable. I mean, Judge Campbell worked for Al Gore and perhaps he is trying to impress fellow Democrates, but this is not the best way to do that. Just like I gave Apple and HP the chance to recuse itself sua sponte, I ask that the Court show Honor before its Democratic party, and recuse itself. This recusal order explains some of the abuse that has been demonstrated in this case as well as others. This particular Court is too fixated on myself and not what is at issue. The Court lacks the capacity to allow exercise the 1st amendment right under the petition clause to have access to the Courts because it is biased and short sighted. This case should be consolidated and reasigned to the Honorable Judge Trauger., # 2 Exhibit 20 million families will have to make a Yes or No choice on access to filth. This must occur in the United States. We must take the moral highground on human rights matters., # 3 Exhibit Google is doing somethings, but device makers are chiefly responsible. "But for" the device to access google. There is no google. google is part of safari and explorer. These Defendants are the most liable under tort law, # 4 Exhibit The Court was so eager to abuse its discretion to stay discovery, it could not manage to follow its own rules in allowing me to file a response to respond in opposition within the 10 days. Additionally, the Court has ratified violations of rule 408. The Defendants lawyers should be sanction for breaking the rules of evidence to accomplish an agenda that promote sex trafficking, child pornography, and child molestation. If we are going to start playings games, then I will unfold what amounts to a milton bradley monopoly on such practices, as a mater of self-defense given the reasonable apprehension of bias and prejudice, which is reflected in a continuing pattern of abuse of discretion., # 5 Exhibit Welcome to the future. This is a matter of inevitability. The youth will start rallying around groups like Fight the New Drug and take down those who are in bed with predatory pornographers. This will end in the same way that it has for Tobacco Companies. The will of the people has a way of prevailing, and Americans do not like being exploited, mislead, and lied to. So, Apple and HP can take initiative now, or come back later and say "thank you, you were right, but we were too greedy and self-focused to listen." In any 12 step program, the last step is to fight against the thing that caused you to become addicted as a way of not becoming addicted again. Its not enough for someone just to say "stop doing the addicting activity." They need something to do instead. What former porn addicts can do is to fight like hell to take down Apple, HP, and all other device makers. The FCC, FTC, the Courts, and DOJ should fight this fight for the youth or it will remember them in a bad light., # 6 Exhibit Petition through Porn Harms)(Sevier, Chris)
February 25, 2014 83 First MOTION for Reconsideration re 79 Order on Motion to Stay, 74 Memorandum in Support by Chris Sevier. (Sevier, Chris)
February 20, 2014 82 SUMMONS returned executed by Chris Sevier. Eric Holder served on 2/10/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Summons of Eric Holder)(Sevier, Chris)
February 15, 2014 81 SUMMONS returned executed by Chris Sevier. Mike O'Reilly served on 2/10/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Summons part of summons, # 2 Summons part of summons, # 3 Summons part of summons)(Sevier, Chris)
February 13, 2014 80 RESPONSE in Opposition re 73 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Chris Sevier. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit hmmmm well well well look at what we have here. One cannot even make up how completely outrageous this is. To recuse oneself sua sponte in one products liability action with a pro se attorney in a case against Apple and not another is inconsistent with the elementary prinicples of equity., # 2 Exhibit To discover this, taken with past pratices and the decisions of this Court so far in this case is telling. While Eric Holder would be impressed, neither I nor the general public should be. This will make quite the legacy., # 3 Exhibit If Apple, HP, or this Court thinks that I am the only one who believes that the pornopgrahy the Defendant's distribute is a major problem, they have another thing coming to them., # 4 Exhibit As more and more scientific evidence compiles that the pornography that Apple and HP are distributing is addicting and harmful and as more and more people get used to the idea that the topic of sex should not go undiscussed, the more pressure will build for Apple and HP to give me what I want regardless. Apple and HP will look much better, if they take initiative here. The point of this exhibit is to show that I am not the only one who thinks computer porn is a problem.)(Sevier, Chris)
February 13, 2014 79 Featured Case ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery 73 is GRANTED, pending further Orders of the Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 2/13/14. (xc:Pro se party by NEF)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)
February 10, 2014 78 Featured Case ORDER granting 70 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 2/10/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
February 7, 2014 77 RESPONSE in Opposition re 56 First MOTION Motion for leave to serve the Defendants with more than 25 interrogatories. I am respectfully asking that the Defendants be required to answer all of the questions found in the interrogatories - including their subparts. These interrogator filed by Chris Sevier. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit I'm going to start pulling the Governor of Kansas in on this project - fight the New Drug. Like it was when I was in France petitioning the National Deputy members, our leaders should not just make the punishment for sex crimes more harsh. Instead, the root of the problem must be attacked. To attack the root device makers must be required to sell their products in a safe manner., # 2 Exhibit Apple has a sex trafficking app, # 3 Exhibit One of hundreds of articles about the danger of pornography in relationship to the youth. Apple and Hewlett-Packard, pursuant to their vicious greed and total disregard of the law, are distributing pornography to children with cataclysmic consequences. Their products must be modified to knock it off. These practices are inexcusable, unjust, unbelievable., # 4 Exhibit Here is one of countless testimonials about how pornography was causing this man to become a liability. Human beings have a God shaped void, meant for Christ.. We are always trying to fill that void with things that cannot satisfy and that leave us spirtually dead and wrecked. Pornography is one of those things that is crafted to fill that void in the same way the illegal drugs are. We need to face the fact about who we are not kings of our universe. We are sexual and spiritual beings, who like vessels will be filled with light or darkness depending on what sources we plug into. Apple and Hewlett-Packard's devices make pornography too accessible. They know that we will be forced to interact with it. They have a duty to protect their customers from unwanted addictions. They have a duty to not mislead the public about the dangers of their products.)(Sevier, Chris)
February 5, 2014 76 NOTICE of Filing by Apple Inc., Hewlett Packard re Docket Annotation, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - December 18, 2013 Email from Plaintiff to Defendants' Counsel, # 2 Exhibit B - December 18, 2013 Email from Plaintiff to Defendants' Counsel, # 3 Exhibit C - Plaintiff's Facebook Post, # 4 Exhibit D - December 24, 2013 Email from Plaintiff to Defendants' Counsel, # 5 Exhibit E - January 1, 2014 Email from Plaintiff to Defendants' Counsel, # 6 Exhibit F - January 27, 2014 Email from Plaintiff to Defendants' Counsel)(Ford, Sara)
February 5, 2014 Docket Annotation: At DE 74 , counsel failed to include the mandatory description of the attached exhibits. The exhibits shall be RESUBMITTED by filing a Notice of Filing and attaching the exhibits with the mandatory brief description. (EXAMPLE: Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Police Report dated 1/1/06, # 2 Exhibit 2 Unreported Case Smith v. Jones). (tmw)
February 5, 2014 75 Summons issued as to Eric Holder, Mike O'Reilly, Edith Ramirez. (tmw)
February 4, 2014 74 MEMORANDUM in Support of 73 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Apple Inc., Hewlett Packard . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Ford, Sara)
February 4, 2014 73 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Apple Inc., Hewlett Packard. (Ford, Sara)
February 4, 2014 72 RESPONSE filed by Apple Inc., Hewlett Packard re 64 Amended Complaint filed by Chris Sevier, 63 Notice (Other) filed by Chris Sevier (Opposition to Motion for Leave to Amend). (Ford, Sara) Modified on 2/5/2014 (tmw).
February 4, 2014 71 RESPONSE in Opposition re 60 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by the proponents of sex trafficking and child pornography filed by Chris Sevier. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit here is a typical response to these kinds of harassment motion to dismiss tactics. From this I borrow the legal standard. The application of the legal standard to the first amended and second amended complaint cause their disfavored 12(b)(6) motion to fall as flat, like the Defendant's argument that they are not in violation of child obscenity laws and products liability tort., # 2 Exhibit Here is the second amended complaint that was filed as matter of course in this action, within the 21 day threshold. The motion to dismiss tests the sufficiency of the first amended complaint. The second amended complaint cures the concerns set forth by the Defendants. Apple and Hewlett-Packard have been engaging in false advertising. They are in bed with predatory pornographers who capitalize on Apple and HP's fraud and malicious agenda to compel their customers to form a chemical dependency on their products.)(Sevier, Chris)
February 3, 2014 70 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Apple Inc., Hewlett Packard. (Ford, Sara)
January 29, 2014 69 REPLY to Response to Motion re 49 Second MOTION to Consolidate Cases 3:13-cv-1450, 3:13-cv-00607, and 3:13-cv-01159 filed by Chris Sevier. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Rule 24 motion to intervene, # 2 Exhibit proposed complaint that directly involves Apple who has created a second class citizenship, which is just a symptom of how destructive their products are, # 3 Exhibit Here is a youtube video of Tim Cook Speaking on ethics: http://www.youtube.com/watch?v=3ygNKNaMv4c - He talks about the carbon foot print of your products. He talks about leaving things better than you found them. If he was sincere in this regard, he would not be resisting my position set forth in this lawsuit. I have given him the opportunity to make leave Apple products better off than he found them. If he places greed over the ethics he claims to have, he will not be responsive.)(Sevier, Chris)
January 24, 2014 68 RESPONSE in Opposition re 56 First MOTION Motion for leave to serve the Defendants with more than 25 interrogatories. I am respectfully asking that the Defendants be required to answer all of the questions found in the interrogatories - including their subparts. These interrogator filed by Apple Inc., Hewlett Packard. (Ford, Sara)
January 22, 2014 67 DENIAL OF DEFAULT re 51 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Keith Throckmorton, Clerk of Court, on 1/22/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)
January 21, 2014 66 NOTICE of Filing by Chris Sevier re 64 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,, more exhibits (slow internet from current location had to break them up) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Here is an article about how Apple's and HP's predatory pornographers employ scams that get their customers hooked on the highly addictive drug of computer pornography. If my proposal is enforced, then these scams that Apple and HP have been ratifying and authorizing will be less effective and destructive. Apple and HP have developed products that are defective and dangerous under there current design because they open the door, invite, encourage, and welcome predatory pornographers to prey on our sons and daughters. The FCC, FTC, and DOJ cannot let these dishonest technology companies pollute our world any longer. America must take the moral high ground. We are world leaders. We must send the message to humanity that we care about protecting innocences. That was the rationale behind me joining the military. This sexual holocaust must end. The FCC and FTC must act. I have provided the legal basis for responsiveness., # 2 Exhibit The purpose of this exhibit is to show that even Wikipedia recognizes porn pop ups. Apple and Hewlett-Packard could protect their customers from porn pop ups, but these Defendants are in bed with the sexual predators who subject us to these pop ups. These pops ups help Apple and HP above all others. We cannot ever afford to have porn defined as part of our every day life., # 3 Exhibit This is an article about a man who gets a porn pop up that leads to child pornography. The man reports this matter to the police. The police end up arresting the man who made the report. The people who should be arrested are Apple and Hewlett-Packard for enabling this scenario in the first place. Our elected officials are letting us down. Human beings are sexual and spiritual beings. If we lose sight of that the economy will suffer no matter what economic policies are in place or not in place. We need our leaders to ensure that we are healthy sexually and spiritually and everything else will improve along with that., # 4 Exhibit Here is an article about Apple attempting to distribute their cancerous and highly addictive drug of pornography to the Nation of China. China, who is starting to look more like a world super power than the United States, was not putting up with it. Apple is a drug dealer. They are at the helm of a criminal enterprise that is a consequence of their fraud and greed, as they impose the horrors of computer pornography onto our world. HP is right along side of them along with all other device makers, who are all in bed with pornographers because they are the paramount financial beneficiaries of this unregulated landscape. This must STOP NOW, # 5 Exhibit This is an article that shows that Apple has duped the world. In the article, the author praises Apple for taking a stand against pornography. The author, a mother, encourages parents to buy Apple's products for taking the moral high ground. Meanwhile, Apple has done absolutely nothing to protect against pornography. They have enabled more and more porn to spill into the lives of their customers. This kind of false advertising and fraud that targets our children and threatens our families is flagrantly outrageous. The FCC, FTC, and DOJ non responsiveness is unacceptable. A joint task force with the United Kingdom is in order., # 6 Exhibit This exhibit is an article about how the buying reselling of computers exposes children to pornography in direct violation of obscenity laws. If this filtering program was proposed by the British Prime Minister it would protect from these things happening., # 7 Exhibit This is an article about how Apple's marketing plan of selling porn free devices is completely hypocritical. They were merely making false assertion so that family would believe that their products were safer than Androids. Apple products, Android products, HP products are all loaded with smut. They are distribution centers of poisonous pornography that is crippling society., # 8 Exhibit Hewlett-Packard cannot say that they do not know what pornography is. They fired CEO Mark Hurd for sexually harassing a porn star. HP's extremely reaction to the sexual harassment was a publicity stunt to show that they have a zero tolerance to sex offenses. Meanwhile, they are the worlds largest distributor of child pornography. They are seated at the helm of a sex trafficking enterprise. The FCC, FTC, and DOJ cannot allow this. The American public is beginning to see through this elaborate failure on the part of our leaders., # 9 Exhibit Steve Jobs: If you want porn, get an Android. Apparently Apple does know what porn is., # 10 Exhibit DOJ Child porn case that HP is culpable in., # 11 Exhibit HP's true legacy)(Sevier, Chris)
January 21, 2014 65 NOTICE of Filing by Chris Sevier re 64 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,, Exhibits to the Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit this exhibit is an article that highlights that Apple and HP are supporters of gay marriage. Gay marriage is not an equal protection matter. Gay people were not born gay - they were born as equally broken as the rest of humanity. Gay people are not a class of their own any more than people who have sex with animals are. Gay people are essentially sex addicts. Apple and HP want to create as many sex addicts as possible because they know that their products constitute the largest distribution of porn in the world. They want people having sex with their products because they understand how the science of dopamine works., # 2 Exhibit This article is key to this case. The writer highlights Apple's hypocrisy in false marketing. Apple literally takes the position that ?if you want to buy a porn free device, buy our products, not Androids." They were saying to the world, buy from us because we will not expose you to highly addictive porn. They falsely claimed that their iPhones were free from porn because they removed porn aps from their stores. This was totally false. Aps like play boy remained in their ap store, but far worse is the fact that their iPhone has Safari on it. Safari is the worlds largest porn ap off all time. The FCC, FTC, and DOJ cannot allow Apple to false advertise in this way, given the fact that they are violating obscenity laws in the first place., # 3 Exhibit This exhibit is showing the url for Apple's Christmas commercial, # 4 Exhibit Adult friend finder is one of the Defendants predatory pornography agents. Adult friend finder is notorious for posting misleading ads all over the web and Facebook, targeting teenagers, hoping to get them addicted to pornography. Adult friend finder is so out of control that they created a complaint portion to their website. Exposing customers to predatory pornographers for their personal benefit cannot be tolerated by the United States. Device makers must do more to keep their customers from acquiring unwanted pornography addiction and sex addiction., # 5 Exhibit An article talking about predatory pornographers using tactics to suck young people into porn addictions, which benefits companies like Apple and Hewlett-Packard above all. This has to end., # 6 Exhibit A document highlighting some of the tactics used by the predatory pornographers that Apple and HP have commissioned to cause their customers to become codependent on their devices., # 7 Exhibit Here is an article regarding the British Prime Minister which discusses the fact that after he announced his resolve to fight computer porn, it has become clear that something can be done about this problem. There are ways to make companies make highly destructive computer porn harder to access. The FTC, FCC, and DOJ must be responsive in working with the United Kingdom to help push our world back towards innocence. It is a human rights violation to not make computer companies comply with obscenity laws. This can be done., # 8 Exhibit Here is an article on revenge porn. Because the DOJ, FTC, FCC are not making Apple modify their defective devices to comply with obscenity laws, they have opened the door to a host of dangerous and damaging practices one of which is "revenge porn." There are girls who have committed suicide as a result of revenge porn; Apple and HP executives could be said to have committed manslaughter by proliferating a system like that. They must be required to make pornography harder to access. There needs to be a severe crack down by the DOJ, FTC, and FCC. We must protect women and children., # 9 Exhibit Here is an article about a 10 year old boy who watched computer porn on his mom's filterless device. He then went out and raped a young girl. I do not blame the boy, as much as I blame the DOJ, FTC, FCC, Apple, and HP for not making it harder to access pornography by default. Such tragic events could be avoided if the rule of law was applied to HP, Apple, and all other companies. Our Nation is collectively unhealthy right now. We must act., # 10 Exhibit Evidence of Google's responsiveness as the filing of this lawsuit. Google must do more. Under the "google image tabe" google needs to approve the content before it allows it to be displayed. This must be imposed on them., # 11 Exhibit Here is an article from the UK that states: ast week, a man in the U.S. sued Apple for not including a default safe mode that prevented him from accessing porn. Chris Sevier said his Macbook led him to a serious porn addiction that resulted in depression and his family leaving him. While many initially mocked the case, the UK is now asking tech companies to do exactly what Sevier asked for, showing how serious lawmakers around the world are taking the issue of online pornography. Now the UNITED STATES must be responsive. How dare my own Nation not proactively be responsive to this major problem that Apple, HP, and other device makers have inflicted on our world. RESPOND)(Sevier, Chris)
January 21, 2014 64 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Chris Sevier. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A former Apple executive explains howApple's new Christmas Ad highlights their hypocrisy and the systemic problems they have inflicted on our society by subjecting us to predatory pornographers. The ad shows how Apple targets families and especially young boys and how their defective products high expose us to content that bonds us closer to their machinery than to real people., # 2 Exhibit This article shows that the FTC is all too familiar with Apple's fraudulent business tactics. Apple's fraud through iTunes is nothing compared to the fraud they have engaged in surround the distribution of highly addicting pornography. The FCT, DOJ, and FCC must make Apple comply with child obscenity laws. Their products (along with all other device makers) must not be allowed to leave the store with a minor in its current condition., # 3 Exhibit This article exposes Apple in another lie. Apple began marketing themselves as selling porn free products to appear to be pro-family. Yet, they continued to sell and distribute porn through iTunes. The FCC, FTC, DOJ, and this Court cannot allow this kind of false advertising and targeting of families and children. The pornography that computer companies have smeared throughout the world is have horrible impact on societies. It is not causing us to "think differently" in a good way. The spread of easily assessable pornography is highjacking intimacy and the ability to bond. It is leaving people lonelier than ever. See Don Jon and Her., # 4 Exhibit Here are some of the gospel of lies that HP, Apple, and other device makers spread by subjecting us to predatory pornographers. These lies can be stamped out by making device makers comply with obscenity laws. Just because computer and phone companies sell fancy technology does not make them any more special than any other company that exposes their customers to porn. This matter is not a political one. This matter is about our leaders taking the initiative to protect women and children and to ratified the rule of law., # 5 Exhibit This exhibit shows that Apple markets sex as being fun and harmless to kids because it wants their customers to be highly sexually activity. Apple wants their customers to be masturbating to their products because they know that humans have the capacity to bond with inanimate objects - no different than guys with blow up dolls.)(Sevier, Chris)
January 21, 2014 63 NOTICE of Filing by Chris Sevier Second Amended Complaint (Sevier, Chris)
January 15, 2014 62 INTERROGATORIES Propounded to Apple and Hewlett-Packard by Chris Sevier.(Sevier, Chris)
January 15, 2014 61 MEMORANDUM in Support of 60 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Apple Inc., Hewlett Packard . (Ford, Sara)
January 15, 2014 60 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Apple Inc., Hewlett Packard. (Ford, Sara)
January 13, 2014 59 RESPONSE in Opposition re 51 First MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Apple Inc., Hewlett Packard. (Ford, Sara)
January 10, 2014 58 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chris Sevier re 54 Reply to Response to Motion,,,,,,,,,,,, (Sevier, Chris)
January 10, 2014 57 MEMORANDUM in Support of 56 First MOTION Motion for leave to serve the Defendants with more than 25 interrogatories. I am respectfully asking that the Defendants be required to answer all of the questions found in the interrogatories - including their subparts. These interrogator filed by Chris Sevier . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit First set of interrogatories. There interrogatories are easy to answer. There are more than 25. But in asking the Defendants to answer the interrogatory and their subparts will help all us reason through the vital legal questions presented in this action. The Defendants should be required to answer them.)(Sevier, Chris)
January 10, 2014 56 First MOTION Motion for leave to serve the Defendants with more than 25 interrogatories. I am respectfully asking that the Defendants be required to answer all of the questions found in the interrogatories - including their subparts. These interrogatories may help the Defendants better think through some of the legal issues raised in this action. Granting my request will be helpful to all of us. by Chris Sevier. (Sevier, Chris)
January 9, 2014 55 RESPONSE in Opposition re 44 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases President should follow the Prime Minister and do his job to enforce the child obscenity laws that Apple and Hewlett-sextrafficking-Packard are molesting without any consequences, 49 Second MOTION to Consolidate Cases 3:13-cv-1450, 3:13-cv-00607, and 3:13-cv-01159 filed by Apple Inc., Hewlett Packard. (Ford, Sara)
January 8, 2014 Bar status of Attys Sara Ford and Jeffrey Doss of AL verified as active this date. (tmw)
January 7, 2014 54 REPLY to Response to Motion re 33 First MOTION to Disqualify Counsel this is the reply to the response to the opposition to the motion to disqualify counsel. But the response does not appear to be in the docket history for some reason. filed by Chris Sevier. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Here is an indication of the kinds of ethical problems that are going to arise in this action. Here, Hewlett-Sextrafficking-Packard's boss was taken down by a former porn star. The perils of porn are at work within the frame work of the Defendants. But this kind of relevant situation was not found in Apple, so they are not equal defendants, and do not merit a joint representation. Let's spread the wealth., # 2 Exhibit By their own omission, Apple acknowledges that porn is harmful speech, but it ignores its duty to comply with child obscenity laws. Make no mistake about it, Apple and HP are selling a bundle of smut in the form of an electronic box to minors., # 3 Exhibit I am asking this Court to please familiarize itself with this website and the testimonials found on the website. She's Somebody's Daughter. The testimonies from the men and women on this sight are powerful, and if Apple and Hewlett Packard actually cared, they would install these pre-set filters for the brave men and women who have stepped out of the shadows and provided testimony on this website., # 4 Exhibit This was an article that appeared in my news feed by one of my friends on facebook yesterday. There is a bandwagon that is being generated that is going to come back to bite Apple. If Professor Ford was not old and out of touch she would run to her clients - take command - and convince them to comply with the demands that I have set forward that will inevitiably be imposed one way or another because this problem is out of control., # 5 Exhibit Countless attorneys attend Church of Highlands in Birmingham that is greatly opposed to online porn and the harmful impact it is having. Upon information and belief, Professor Ford is a member. She cannot be a member of this organization and champion the cause of Apple and Hewlett-Packard without preverting justice and molesting integrity demanded by the local rules and the BPR, # 6 Exhibit Here is an example of what a harassing motion to disqualify looks like., # 7 Exhibit example of what an actually harassment motion to disqualify looks like in Tennessee, # 8 Exhibit there are litearally hundreds of these Christian Organizations popping up across the globe. Apple and Hewlett-Packard are their worst adversary. If Professor Ford was actually capable of appearing in this matter, she would convince her clients be part of the solution, not a huge part of the problem., # 9 Exhibit there are litearally hundreds of these Christian Organizations popping up across the globe. Apple and Hewlett-Packard are their worst adversary. If Professor Ford was actually capable of appearing in this matter, she would convince her clients be part of the solution, not a huge part of the problem.)(Sevier, Chris)
January 2, 2014 53 RESPONSE in Opposition re 33 First MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Apple Inc., Hewlett Packard. (Ford, Sara)
December 30, 2013 52 Featured Case ORDER denying 47 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 12/30/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)
December 30, 2013 51 First MOTION for Entry of Default by Chris Sevier. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit An article from the UK that explains that at first the press ridiculed my complaint, but then the British Prime Minister moved to give me exactly what I was askig for. The implication of that is that you are acting as the President of the United States in effect. Under these circumstances, given what is at stake - default Apple and Hewlett-Packard, # 2 Exhibit Rent this movie and check out the Witherspoon Institute Report that is an exhibit in this action.)(Sevier, Chris)
December 28, 2013 50 MEMORANDUM in Support of 49 Second MOTION to Consolidate Cases 3:13-cv-1450, 3:13-cv-00607, and 3:13-cv-01159 filed by Chris Sevier 3:13-cv-1450, 3:13-cv-00607, and 3:13-cv-01159. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit complaint in the case challenging the Amendment to the Tennessee Constiution that bars same sex marriage, # 2 Exhibit Prez, # 3 Exhibit One article from the UK that identifies that the filing of the Apple Lawsuit enabled the British Prime Minister to work to provide me the relief I demand because unlike the President and the Governor of the state of Tennessee, he sees online pornography as the cancer that it is, and he wants actual accountability over porn - not sham accountability because he is humble enough to understand human nature., # 4 Exhibit Google has responded to the British Prime Minister demand, which is an omission of guilt on Apple and HP's behalf. But what we need is actual accountability that does not infringe on speech unduly or make it so that computer companies cannot compete on the same playing field. If Google has responded, why can't our Governor and President., # 5 Exhibit Although I temporaily nonsuited the other case against Bill O'Reilly. I will open it right back up and apply much press as I need to until Apple, Hewlett Packard, the President, and the Governor come to their senses and enforce the child obscenity laws that is having devasting impact on our nation. There would not even be these pro-same sex marriage lawsuits if their were actual filters in place on our devices that connect to the internet. I am not the only one who should be caring about the welfare of our children, women, and marriages. We need protections in place so that we do not have poisoned hearted pro-same sex marriage types masquerading as tollerant only to blatantly commit the kind of persecution that is taking place in Egypt. None of us are above the United States Constitution and other laws which were crafted from the Bible, and by extension, none of us are above God, and our Courts, Congress, media, business, and governmental executives need to start acting like it., # 6 Exhibit For the Court's convenience here is the complaint in the A&E case.)(Sevier, Chris)
December 28, 2013 49 Second MOTION to Consolidate Cases 3:13-cv-1450, 3:13-cv-00607, and 3:13-cv-01159 by Chris Sevier. (Sevier, Chris)
December 27, 2013 48 MEMORANDUM in Support of 41 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, 47 First MOTION for Reconsideration re 41 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by Chris Sevier . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Again, I am filing this, # 2 Exhibit Again, the exhibit that demonstrates that this action provoked responsivenes from the British Prime Minister. Since the President is not being responsive, I need the Court to do the executives job by enforcing the law. I have vest enormous power in this Court by bringing this action. The Defendants here do not deserve extended time to invent technical excuses that will keep millions of people in bondage., # 3 Exhibit You guys need to all rent this movie. Professor Ford needs to go tell her clients about the implications of it so that they might come to their senses and save us from bondage by shifting intentionality onto those who want to see porn to have to take the extra step to do so. We need more than just shame accountabililty over the power of sexual urges that if acted upon can devastate our lives and the lives of others.)(Sevier, Chris)
December 26, 2013 47 First MOTION for Reconsideration re 41 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer by Chris Sevier. (Sevier, Chris)
December 26, 2013 45 MEMORANDUM in Support of 44 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases President should follow the Prime Minister and do his job to enforce the child obscenity laws that Apple and Hewlett-sextrafficking-Packard are molesting without any consequences filed by Chris Sevier . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit the first amended complaint in the other case that could be consolidated with this action. Consolidation might better help keep the peace, since I am admitting to "sin" in one case and opposing "sin" of others in the other action, for lack of a better term.. What is at issue is limitations on destructive forms of speech. These cases both involved political social issues that connect directly with spirituality and sexuality. Consolidation could square with Judicial economy., # 2 Exhibit An article from the UK in which the editor identifies correctly that my decision to file this action started a debate which opened the door for the British Prime Minister to give me the relief that I am demanding. However, I want our President, Defendant Barack Obama to do his job and enforce the child obscenity laws so that groups like A21, stop sex trafficking now, and others do not have to do his job for him. Defendant Obama has a connection to this case because Apple and Hewlett-Packard are violating child obscenity laws in distributing pornography to minors. Not only are Apple and HP selling unsafe products that give rise to a products liability claim, they are breaking the laws that Defendant Obama should be enforcing, like David Cameron is., # 3 Exhibit Here is proof that Google is being responsive to the call of the British Prime Minister, which constitutes an indirect omission of guilt that Apple and HP are selling dangerous products and breaking the law by not selling their devices on safe mode. I want Apple and Hewlett-Packard to stop proliferating crime and the destruction of marriages in the same way that Google is doing their part to be responsive. I want the hundreds of millions of people who stand with Phil to jump on this bandwagon with me to help push our Nation back towards innocense., # 4 Exhibit My opponets should remember that on top of being an overseas missionary, I am an EDM singer, who is doing major collabs. I have the ear of the press at any time. I have them blowing up my cases because the reaction supports the notion that heart is the well spring of life and we need decisions from the courts and laws enforce, not to be a "kill joy" but to help society flurish and to protect us from us.)(Sevier, Chris)
December 26, 2013 44 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases President should follow the Prime Minister and do his job to enforce the child obscenity laws that Apple and Hewlett-sextrafficking-Packard are molesting without any consequences by Chris Sevier. (Sevier, Chris)
December 23, 2013 46 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. and Hewlett Packard, filed by Chris Sevier.(dt)
December 20, 2013 43 Featured Case ORDER granting 40 Motion for Sara A. Ford to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 12/20/13. (af)
December 20, 2013 42 Featured Case ORDER granting 39 Motion for Jeffrey P. Doss to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 12/20/13. (af)
December 20, 2013 41 Featured Case ORDER granting 38 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Apple Inc. answer due 1/15/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 12/20/13. (af)
December 19, 2013 40 MOTION for attorney(s) Sara A. Ford to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-1664433) by Apple Inc., Hewlett Packard. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Wiseman, Thomas)
December 19, 2013 39 MOTION for attorney(s) Jeffrey P. Doss to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-1664425) by Apple Inc., Hewlett Packard. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Wiseman, Thomas)
December 19, 2013 38 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 28 Amended Complaint by Apple Inc., Hewlett Packard. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Email)(Wiseman, Thomas)
December 19, 2013 37 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Hewlett Packard. (Wiseman, Thomas)
December 19, 2013 36 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc.. (Wiseman, Thomas)
December 19, 2013 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Anderton Wiseman, III on behalf of All Defendants (Wiseman, Thomas)
December 19, 2013 34 MEMORANDUM in Support of 33 First MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Chris Sevier . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Email communications without first complying with LR 83.01)(Sevier, Chris)
December 19, 2013 33 First MOTION to Disqualify Counsel by Chris Sevier. (Sevier, Chris)
December 12, 2013 32 NOTICE of Filing by Chris Sevier (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Some documents from Porn Harms that show a correlation between sex trafficking and internet pornography. As assibility to internet porn increases so increases the demand side of child pornography and sex related crimes, # 2 Exhibit Some materials from an organziation called Somebody's Daughter who champions the idea that internet pornography depletes the capacity to experience intimacy amongst a litany of other systemic and social harms. These documents support my notion that the burden should be on those who want to see porn to have to take the steps to remove installed filters, instead of shifting the burden onto those who want to avoid looking at porn.)(Sevier, Chris)
December 12, 2013 31 SUMMONS returned executed by Chris Sevier. All Defendants. (Sevier, Chris)
November 22, 2013 30 Summons issued as to Apple Inc., Hewlett Packard. (tmw)
November 21, 2013 Completed Summons received in Clerk's Office this date. (tmw)
November 14, 2013 29 Summons issued as to Apple Inc. (tmw)
November 13, 2013 28 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Chris Sevier. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Witherspoon Institute Report)(Sevier, Chris)
October 28, 2013 27 Featured Case ORDER: Nevertheless, the Court will allow Plaintiff additional time to serve Defendant, to and including December 2, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 10/28/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)
October 24, 2013 26 Featured Case ORDER granting 13 Motion to Redact prior temporary address listed in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 10/24/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)
October 23, 2013 25 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Chris Sevier. (Sevier, Chris)
October 21, 2013 24 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Within twenty (20) days of the date of entry of this Order, therefore, Plaintiff shall file a written statement showing good cause for his failure to serve the Defendants within 120 days after the filing of the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 10/21/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)
August 12, 2013 23 Certified Mail Returned as Undeliverable. 18 Order sent to Chris Sevier. (tmw)
August 12, 2013 DE 9 resent via ECF to pltf on this date. (tmw)
August 7, 2013 Pltf called and requested his address to be updated to reflect Unit 247. Address updated this date. (tmw)
August 6, 2013 22 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. 18 Order sent to Chris Sevier. (tmw)
August 5, 2013 21 Certified Mail Returned as Undeliverable. 9 Order re-mailed to Chris Sevier. (tmw)
August 5, 2013 20 Mail Returned as Undeliverable - Attempted Not Known. 9 Order re-mailed to Chris Sevier. (tmw)
August 2, 2013 19 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT re 18 Order. (tmw)
August 1, 2013 18 Featured Case ORDER re 11 Motion to Have Access to ECF PACER. Motion granted to file through ECF. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 8/1/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)
July 31, 2013 17 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT re-mailing 9 Order. (tmw)
July 29, 2013 16 Certified Mail Returned as Undeliverable - Refused. 9 Order sent to Chris Sevier. (tmw)
July 29, 2013 15 Mail Returned as Undeliverable - Refused. 9 Order sent to Chris Sevier. (tmw)
July 26, 2013 14 MEMORANDUM in Support of 13 MOTION filed by Chris Sevier. (tmw)
July 26, 2013 13 MOTION for Redaction and Notice of Change, by Chris Sevier. Pltf's address updated to 9 Music Sq S, Nashville, TN 37203. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2 - Google printout, # 2 Exhibit 3 - Letter, # 3 envelope)(tmw)
July 23, 2013 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of 11 MOTION to have access to ECF Pacer filed by Chris Sevier. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Memorandum in Support filed in case 10C-4568)(dt)
July 23, 2013 11 MOTION to have access to ECF Pacer by Chris Sevier. (dt)
July 23, 2013 10 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT re 9 Order. (dt)
July 23, 2013 9 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles for entry of a scheduling order; decision on all pretrial, nondispositive motions; and a report and recommendation on any dispositive motions. The scheduling order shall include a target trial date. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 7/23/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(dt)
July 22, 2013 8 RESPONSE filed by Chris Sevier to 3 Order or Alternatively Notice of Filing: Ex Parte Response to the Order Regarding the Filing Fee. (dt)
July 22, 2013 7 NOTICE of Filing and Proposed Rule 68 Motion Offer of Judgment for the Defendant to Consider filed by Chris Sevier. (w/ attached Exhibit 1, Cover of Book The Meaning of Marriage) (dt) Modified Text on 7/25/2013 (dt).
July 22, 2013 6 RECEIPT #34675027475 in the amount of $400.00 posted by Chris Sevier re 1 Complaint. (dt)
July 8, 2013 5 Certified Mail Returned as Undeliverable. 3 Order sent to Chris Sevier. (tmw)
July 8, 2013 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. 3 Order sent to Chris Sevier. (tmw)
July 1, 2013 3 Featured Case ORDER: The plaintiff is directed to file with the court, within ten (10) days of the entry of this order, a signed statement setting forth with specificity (as detailed as possible) the sources and amounts of any and all income, benefits, or assets he expects to use to support himself for the next twelve (12) months, including, but not limited to: regular wages, disability benefits, Supplemental Security Income (SSI) payments, food stamps, workers compensation, unemployment compensation, real and personal property, assistance from family or friends, etc. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 7/1/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)
June 19, 2013 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Chris Sevier. (af)
June 19, 2013 1 COMPLAINT filed by Chris Sevier against Apple Inc.(af)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Sevier v. Apple Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Sevier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]