Ligon v. United States of America

Respondent: United States of America
Petitioner: Robert Ligon
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00698
Filed: July 15, 2013
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Kevin H. Sharp
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentence
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 17, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Petitioners Motion for Summary Judgment 8 is hereby DENIED.The petitioner is GRANTED thirty (30) days from the date of entry of this order on the docket in which to file whatever Reply to the Response that he may deem appropriate. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 3/17/14. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
June 12, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 6/12/14. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
June 13, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Clerk is directed to send the Movant a Financial Affidavit. If he wishes to have counsel appointed to represent him, Movant shall complete the Financial Affidavit and return it to the Clerk within 20 days from the entry of the instant Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 6/13/14. (xc:Pro se party w/ Financial Affidavit by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
July 1, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court appoints the office of the Federal Public Defender to represent the plaintiff. Appointed counsel shall enter an appearance in this action within fourteen (14) days of the date of entry of this Order. Thereafter, the Court will sch edule a Case Management Conference to discuss the timing and logistics of the Evidentiary Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 7/1/2014. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail)(a copy of the order was sent to the Federal Public Defender via electronic notification). (ds)
July 7, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING HEARING: Case Management Conference set for 8/12/2014 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 7/7/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ds) (Main Document 30 replaced on 7/7/2014) (ds).
August 12, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING HEARING: Pursuant to the Court's prior Order (Docket No. 30), the Court held a Case Management Conference in this action on August 12, 2014. For the reasons stated on the record at the Case Management Conference, the Court wil l hold a status conference on September 22, 2014, at 10:30 a.m., for the purpose of setting an Evidentiary Hearing in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 8/12/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)
November 15, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The United States Attorney for this judicial district shall file an answer, plead or otherwise respond to the motion in accordance with Rule 5, Rules --- § 2255 Cases, within 23 days from the date of entry of this orderon the docket. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 11/15/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ligon v. United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Jimmie Lynn Ramsaur
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Ligon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]