Program 360, LLC v. Cleveland

Plaintiff: Program 360, LLC
Defendant: Scott Cleveland
Case Number: 3:2013cv00789
Filed: August 8, 2013
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Todd J. Campbell
Referring Judge: Juliet E. Griffin
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Jury Trial set for 2/24/2015 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Pretrial Conference set for 2/13/2015 at 1:00 PM before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Exhibit List, Witness List and Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/6/2015. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 10/18/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
November 22, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: A case management conference is scheduled on Wednesday, December 4, 2013, at 11:00 a.m., in Courtroom 764, U.S. Courthouse, 801 Broadway, Nashville, TN, to address the defendant's motion to continue deadlines (Docket Entry No. 23), and any other appropriate extensions or matters in light of defendant's change of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 11/22/13. (dt)
December 4, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Case Management Conference held on 12/4/13. Program 360, LLC shall have until 12/20/13, to file a response to the defendant's counter-claim 26 . The motion to continue deadlines 23 is GRANTED to the extent that the time for the par ties to serve initial disclosures in accord with Rule 26 (a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure is extended to 1/2/14. The deadline for the parties to file a joint mediation statement is extended to 1/24/14. Except as modified herein, the deadlines provided in the orders entered 9/25/13(Docket Entry Nos. 14-15), remain in full force and effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 12/4/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
May 5, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Counsel for the parties shall convene a telephone conference call with the Court on Wednesday, May 14, 2014, at 11:00 a.m., to be initiated by defendant's counsel, to address the parties' joint motion for extension of deadlines [ 37] and whether the scheduling deadlines can be adjusted so that the February 24, 2015, trial date can be maintained. If this date and time presents scheduling conflicts for counsel, they shall confer and call Ms. Jeanne Cox, Courtroom Deputy, at 615-736-5164, to reschedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 5/5/14. (dt)
May 14, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 37 Motion for Extension of Deadlines in the Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 5/14/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
August 1, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESETTING TRIAL/DEADLINES: The Jury Trial is RESET for 11/10/2015 at 9:00 AM and the Pretrial Conference is RESET for 11/2/2015 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Exhibit List, Witness List, and Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/26/2015. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for all other deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 8/1/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)
August 8, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Pursuant to Local Rule 16.01(e)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(d), discovery is not stayed absent order of the District Judge. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Judge in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(d)(5). IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 8/8/13. (la)
March 17, 2015 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: For all these reasons, default judgment is hereby entered for Plaintiff against Defendant for $1,200,000.00 plus post-judgment interest from the date of this Order. This action, including Defendant's Counterclaim, is DISMISSED, and the Clerk is directed to close the file. The pretrial conference set for November 2, 2015, and the jury trial set for November 10, 2015, are canceled. This Order shall constitute the final judgment in this case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 58. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 3/17/15. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
August 26, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant's re 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Notice of Removal filed by Scott Cleveland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 8/26/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(la)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Program 360, LLC v. Cleveland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Program 360, LLC
Represented By: Cynthia S. McKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Cleveland
Represented By: Brent Barriere
Represented By: Andrew B. Campbell
Represented By: Jeanette D. Donnelly
Represented By: J. Graham Matherne
Represented By: Loretta G Mince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]