McKinley v. Bank of America et al

Defendant: Recontrust Company, Bank of America and Green Tree Servicing, LLC
Plaintiff: Stacy McKinley
Case Number: 3:2013cv00883
Filed: August 30, 2013
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Wilson
Presiding Judge: Todd J. Campbell
Referring Judge: Juliet E. Griffin
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 30, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference is reset for 11/12/2013 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 10/30/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
February 20, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Counsel for the parties shall convene another telephone conference call with the Court on Thursday, March 20, 2014, at 4:00 p.m., to be initiated by counsel for defendant Green Tree, to address the status of the plaintiff's efforts to obtain a loan modification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 2/21/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
March 27, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 6/4/2014 at 10:00 AM, to be initiated by plaintiff's counsel, to address whether the plaintiff has been approved for a new loan and/or has closed on the loan or scheduled the closing, and whether the plaintiff's ex-husband has executed an assignment of any interest he has in the property. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 3/27/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKinley v. Bank of America et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Recontrust Company
Represented By: Daniel R. Osborne
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Represented By: Daniel R. Osborne
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Tree Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Klinton W. Alexander
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy McKinley
Represented By: Jennifer M. Porth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]