Lexington Insurance Company v. Lion Oil Company

Plaintiff: Landmark American Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance, Arch Insurance Company, Pembroke Syndicate 4000, SJC 2003/Catlin, Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Chaucer Marine, Syndicate 1084, Navigators Syndicate 1221, Torus Specialty Insurance Company, Talbot Syndicate 1183, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, ACE American Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc., Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania and Lexington Insurance Company
Defendant: Lion Oil Company
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01054
Filed: September 27, 2013
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2013 20 Featured Case ORDER denying 11 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/17/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
November 15, 2013 37 Featured Case ORDER: Geoffrey J. Greeves is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in this action. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of the Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/15/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
November 15, 2013 39 Featured Case ORDER: Vincent E. Morgan is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in this action. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of the Court including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/15/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
January 16, 2014 51 Featured Case ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum, the court finds as follows: The plaintiffs' Request for Judicial Notice (Docket No. 28 ) is GRANTED. The plaintiffs' Motion to Enjoin (Docket No. 26 ) is DENIED. In the exercise of the court's discretion, this case is hereby STAYED in favor of the parallel proceeding in the Western District of Arkansas, Lion Oil Co. v. Nat'l Union Fire Ins. Co. of Pittsburgh, P.A., Civil Action No. 1:13-CV-01071-SOH (W.D. Ark. filed Oct. 8, 2013). The defendant's Motion to Transfer (Docket No. 32 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/16/2014. (hb) Modified text on 1/17/2014 (hb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lexington Insurance Company v. Lion Oil Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landmark American Insurance Company
Represented By: William A. Webster
Represented By: Bradford Telfeyan
Represented By: Glenanne B. Kennedy
Represented By: John Roy Tarpley
Represented By: Amy M. Churan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance
Represented By: William A. Webster
Represented By: Glenanne B. Kennedy
Represented By: Bradford Telfeyan
Represented By: John Roy Tarpley
Represented By: Amy M. Churan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arch Insurance Company
Represented By: Bradford Telfeyan
Represented By: William A. Webster
Represented By: Glenanne B. Kennedy
Represented By: John Roy Tarpley
Represented By: Amy M. Churan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pembroke Syndicate 4000
Represented By: William A. Webster
Represented By: Bradford Telfeyan
Represented By: John Roy Tarpley
Represented By: Glenanne B. Kennedy
Represented By: Amy M. Churan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SJC 2003/Catlin
Represented By: William A. Webster
Represented By: John Roy Tarpley
Represented By: Bradford Telfeyan
Represented By: Amy M. Churan
Represented By: Glenanne B. Kennedy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987
Represented By: William A. Webster
Represented By: John Roy Tarpley
Represented By: Bradford Telfeyan
Represented By: Amy M. Churan
Represented By: Glenanne B. Kennedy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chaucer Marine, Syndicate 1084
Represented By: William A. Webster
Represented By: John Roy Tarpley
Represented By: Bradford Telfeyan
Represented By: Glenanne B. Kennedy
Represented By: Amy M. Churan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Navigators Syndicate 1221
Represented By: Bradford Telfeyan
Represented By: William A. Webster
Represented By: John Roy Tarpley
Represented By: Amy M. Churan
Represented By: Glenanne B. Kennedy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Torus Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: William A. Webster
Represented By: John Roy Tarpley
Represented By: Bradford Telfeyan
Represented By: Glenanne B. Kennedy
Represented By: Amy M. Churan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Talbot Syndicate 1183
Represented By: William A. Webster
Represented By: Bradford Telfeyan
Represented By: John Roy Tarpley
Represented By: Amy M. Churan
Represented By: Glenanne B. Kennedy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: William A. Webster
Represented By: Bradford Telfeyan
Represented By: John Roy Tarpley
Represented By: Glenanne B. Kennedy
Represented By: Amy M. Churan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ACE American Insurance Company
Represented By: William A. Webster
Represented By: Bradford Telfeyan
Represented By: Glenanne B. Kennedy
Represented By: John Roy Tarpley
Represented By: Amy M. Churan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XL Insurance America, Inc.
Represented By: William A. Webster
Represented By: Bradford Telfeyan
Represented By: John Roy Tarpley
Represented By: Amy M. Churan
Represented By: Glenanne B. Kennedy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC
Represented By: William A. Webster
Represented By: Bradford Telfeyan
Represented By: Glenanne B. Kennedy
Represented By: John Roy Tarpley
Represented By: Amy M. Churan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania
Represented By: William A. Webster
Represented By: Bradford Telfeyan
Represented By: John Roy Tarpley
Represented By: Glenanne B. Kennedy
Represented By: Amy M. Churan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: William A. Webster
Represented By: Bradford Telfeyan
Represented By: John Roy Tarpley
Represented By: Glenanne B. Kennedy
Represented By: Amy M. Churan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lion Oil Company
Represented By: Vincent E. Morgan
Represented By: Harold Frederick Humbracht, Jr.
Represented By: Peter M. Gillon
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Greeves
Represented By: Vernon C. Thompson, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]