Mucerino, et al., v. Newman, et al.

Defendant: Jason Lloyd Newman
Plaintiff: Frank Mucerino, Laura Mucerino and Urban Angels Music Group LLC
 
Case Number: 3:2014cv00028
Filed: January 13, 2014
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Dickson
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
 
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 18, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 22 Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order and for Continuance of Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 2/18/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
March 14, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Clerk shall issue Judge Trauger's standard Notice, setting this case for an initial case management conference on Monday, May 19, 2014, at 3:15p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/14/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
March 14, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION: The Temporary Restraining Order issued on 1/22/2014 is hereby CONVERTED into a preliminary injunction as follows: The defendant, his agents, employees, successors, attorneys, and all those in active concert or participation with them, are enjoined and restrained, pursuant to Rule 65, FED. R. CIV. P., from removing, transferring or otherwise divesting any assets and/or monetary funds present in account ****7690, located at Citibank N.A., 19100 Soledad Canyon Road, Canyon Country, California 91351, until further order of the court. No bond will be required to be posted by the plaintiff for the issuance of this preliminary injunction. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/14/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
May 14, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 6/30/2014 at 1:45 PM before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/14/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
June 3, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 Motion for Joinder of Permissive Defendant and for Leave to Amend Pleadings. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/3/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
June 6, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 6/25/2014 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/6/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
August 6, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: This case is not yet ready for an initial case management conference, therefore, the initial case management conference scheduled for August 8, 2014 is CONTINUED and RESET for September 19, 2014 at 2:30 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/6/2014. (ds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Mucerino, et al., v. Newman, et al.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Lloyd Newman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Mucerino
Represented By: William Alan Slone
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Mucerino
Represented By: William Alan Slone
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Urban Angels Music Group LLC
Represented By: William Alan Slone
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]