Hill v. Lincare, Inc.

Plaintiff: Rodney S. Hill, III
Defendant: Lincare, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2014cv00388
Filed: February 6, 2014
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: White
Referring Judge: Juliet E. Griffin
Presiding Judge: John T. Nixon
 
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 25, 2014 11 Featured Case ORDER: Telephone Conference is set for 4/7/2014 at 1:00 PM, to be initiated by defendant's counsel, to address briefing the pending motions, rescheduling the initial case management conference, and any other appropriate matters. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 3/25/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
April 9, 2014 13 Featured Case ORDER: Telephone conference held on 4/7/2014. The plaintiff shall have until April 11, 2014, to file a short sur-response to the defendant's reply. Inasmuch as this case will either be remanded to the Circuit Court of Warren County or transf erred to the Eastern District of Tennessee, unless otherwise directed by the Court, there will be no further proceedings before the Magistrate Judge in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 4/9/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
August 5, 2014 15 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(l)(A)(ii), this action is DISMISSED with prejudice. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of the Court to close this case. Signed by Senior Judge John T. Nixon on 8/5/2015. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hill v. Lincare, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney S. Hill, III
Represented By: John T. Reese
Represented By: Heather F.S. Fleming
Represented By: Ed Reynolds Davies, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincare, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Hunter Kitchens
Represented By: Andrew S. Naylor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]