Alfich v. Social Security Administration

Defendant: Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Myrna Alfich
Case Number: 3:2014cv00577
Filed: February 26, 2014
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Referring Judge: Juliet E. Griffin
Presiding Judge: John T. Nixon
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 9, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff shall have 30 days from entry of this order to file a motion for judgment on the record and accompanying memorandum. Defendant shall, within 30 days of the filing of the plaintiff's motion, file a response. Plaintiff shall have 14 days from the filing of the response to file a reply if necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 6/9/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
July 31, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: This case has been reassigned to the undersigned judge 13 . This case is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a scheduling order, for decision on all nondispositive matters, and for a Report and Recommendation on disposition of Plaintiff's Complaint for judicial review of the decision of the Social Security Administration. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 7/31/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
November 20, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 12 Motion for Judgment on the Record. It is recommended that the motion be denied and the Commissioner's decision be affirmed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 11/20/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alfich v. Social Security Administration
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myrna Alfich
Represented By: David Clyde Downard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]