Metro Medical Supply, Inc. v. Rheumatology Associates, P.A.

Defendant: Rheumatology Associates, P.A.
Plaintiff: Metro Medical Supply, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2014cv00789
Filed: March 20, 2014
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Referring Judge: Joe Brown
Presiding Judge: John T. Nixon
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 28, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 9/17/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 11/17/2014. Replies due by 1/5/2015. Telephone Conference set for 8/18/2014 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. Jury Trial set for 4/14/2015 at 9:00 AM before Senior Judge John T. Nixon. Pretrial Conference set for 4/3/2015 at 10:00 AM before Senior Judge John T. Nixon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 5/28/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
August 12, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED PROCEDURE FOR CONFERENCE CALLS signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 8/12/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)
August 18, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: A telephone conference was held with the parties on August 18, 2014. All written discovery will be completed by October 17, 2014. Dispositive motions will be due December 17, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 8/18/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metro Medical Supply, Inc. v. Rheumatology Associates, P.A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rheumatology Associates, P.A.
Represented By: William Alan Slone
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metro Medical Supply, Inc.
Represented By: James P. Warfield
Represented By: Kenneth M. Bryant
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]