Abundes et al v. Athens Food Services, LLC et al

Defendant: Athens Food Services 1, Athens Food Services, Athens Food Services, LLC, Mohammad S. Rasras, Adel Elostta and Evangelia Dina Kazakos Elostta
Plaintiff: Sanjuana Ernestina Yebra, Jesus Emanuel Abundes and Juan Antonio Abundes
Case Number: 3:2014cv01278
Filed: June 9, 2014
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Todd J. Campbell
Referring Judge: Juliet E. Griffin
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 24, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 6/24/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ds)
June 25, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/7/2014 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin. Prior to the initial case management conference, counsel for the parties shall also confer and shall prepare a proposed, joint init ial case management order. Counsel shall e-file the proposed order prior to the initial case management conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 6/25/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ds)
August 7, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: By August 29, 2014, the plaintiffs shall file a notice of election, indicating whether they (1) want to maintain this case as a collective action; (2) will limit this case to the individual claims of the three existing plaintiffs; or (3) wi ll seek to add additional individual plaintiffs and limit this case to the individual claims of the existing plaintiffs plus the additionally added plaintiffs. If the plaintiffs seek to maintain this case as a collective action, a further case management conference will be held on Friday, September 5, 2014, at 1:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 8/7/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)
August 25, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #1 signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 8/25/2014. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)
August 25, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #2: Discovery due by 12/15/2014. Amended Pleadings due by 1/12/2015. Motions due by 5/20/2015. There shall be no stay of discovery before the December 15, 2014 deadline for completion of fact discovery or the April 16, 2015 deadline for completion of expert discovery even if a dispositive motion is filed prior thereto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 8/25/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)
September 9, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Jury Trial set for 10/27/2015 at 9:00 AM and Pretrial Conference set for 10/19/2015 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Exhibit List, Witness List, and Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/9/2015. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 9/9/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)
June 10, 2014 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management. Discovery is not stayed absent order of the District Judge. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Judge. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 6/10/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abundes et al v. Athens Food Services, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Athens Food Services 1
Represented By: Perry Allan Craft
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Athens Food Services
Represented By: Perry Allan Craft
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Athens Food Services, LLC
Represented By: Perry Allan Craft
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammad S. Rasras
Represented By: Perry Allan Craft
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adel Elostta
Represented By: Perry Allan Craft
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evangelia Dina Kazakos Elostta
Represented By: Perry Allan Craft
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sanjuana Ernestina Yebra
Represented By: Jennifer M. Lankford
Represented By: Thomas I. Carlton, Jr.
Represented By: Peter C. Robison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Emanuel Abundes
Represented By: Peter C. Robison
Represented By: Jennifer M. Lankford
Represented By: Thomas I. Carlton, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Antonio Abundes
Represented By: Peter C. Robison
Represented By: Jennifer M. Lankford
Represented By: Thomas I. Carlton, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]