Sevier v. Google et al Featured Case

Defendant: Bill Haslam, Microsoft, xBox, Motarola, LG, Android, Samsung, Verizon, Google, Bob Cooper and Planned Parenthood
Plaintiff: Chris Sevier
Case Number: 3:2014cv01313
Filed: June 17, 2014
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Referring Judge: E. Clifton Knowles
Presiding Judge: Kevin H. Sharp
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 24, 2014 8 MEMORANDUM in Support of 7 MOTION filed by Chris Sevier. (tmw)
June 24, 2014 7 MOTION for ECF/Electronic Filing as the Courts Allowed in 3:13cv607 and in 3:13cv1450, by Chris Sevier. (tmw)
June 23, 2014 6 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT re 5 Order. (ds)
June 23, 2014 5 Featured Case ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 72(a) and (b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), this action is hereby referred to the Magistrate Judge for consideration of all pretrial matters. Any dispositive motions filed shall be considered by the Magistrate Judge, who shall submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for disposition. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 6/23/14. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(dt)
June 19, 2014 NOTICE mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included).. (afs)
June 19, 2014 4 RECEIPT #34675031991 in the amount of $400 re 1 Complaint. (afs)
June 18, 2014 3 NOTICE from USDC Clerk regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement requirements. (afs)
June 17, 2014 2 Sealed Documents In support of Complaint 1 filed by Chris Sevier. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 2-Supporting Documents to Complaint, # 2 Attachment 3-Supporting Documents to Complaint, # 3 Attachment-4 Supporting Documents to Complaint, # 4 Attachment 5-Supporting Documents to Complaint, # 5 Attachment 6-Supporting Documents to Complaint, # 6 Attachment -7 Supporting Documents to Complaint, # 7 Attachment-8 Supporting Documents to Complaint)(afs)
June 17, 2014 1 COMPLAINT against Android, Bob Cooper, Google, Bill Haslam, LG, Microsoft, Motarola, Planned Parenthood, Samsung, Verizon, xBox, filed by Chris Sevier.(afs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sevier v. Google et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Haslam
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: xBox
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motarola
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Android
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Cooper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Planned Parenthood
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Sevier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]