Anderson v. Nissan North America, Inc.

Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Donnie Anderson
Case Number: 3:2014cv01319
Filed: June 18, 2014
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Referring Judge: Joe Brown
Presiding Judge: John T. Nixon
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 14, 2014 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for September 19, 2014 is RESET for Wednesday, September 10, 2014, at 3:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/14/2014. (ds)
September 10, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Motion to Amend due by 2/13/2015. Discovery due by 5/15/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 7/15/2015. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/10/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)
August 7, 2014 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. Senior Judge John T. Nixon recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Aleta A. Trauger for all further proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge John T. Nixon on 8/5/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ds)
August 8, 2014 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Upon the reassignment of this case to Judge Trauger, the reference to the Magistrate Judge is WITHDRAWN, and the initial case management conference scheduled before the Magistrate Judge on August 19, 2014 is CANCELLED. The Uncontested Motion for Extension of Time (Docket No. 7) is GRANTED, and the defendant may have until September 8, 2014 within which to file a responsive pleading. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue Judge Trauger's standard Notice, setting this case for an initial case management conference before her on September 19, 2014 at 2:45 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/8/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Nissan North America, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnie Anderson
Represented By: Jonathan A. Street
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]